HLS 20RS-28 ENGROSSED 2020 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 6 BY REPRESENTATIVE GREGORY MILLER STATE AGENCIES: Provides relative to reports by executive branch agencies 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 49:1401, relative to reports by agencies in the executive branch 3 of state government; to repeal provisions providing for the automatic expiration of 4 requirements for such reports and related provisions for extending such 5 requirements; to provide for notification concerning such reports; to provide for 6 evaluation of reporting requirements by legislative committees; and to provide for 7 related matters. 8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 9 Section 1. R.S. 49:1401 is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 10 ยง1401. Reports of the executive branch 11 A. Except as provided in Subsection C of this Section, a legislative mandate 12 to produce any report required of an executive branch agency first occurring on or 13 after July 1, 2018, shall expire on the July first following the fifth regular session 14 after the mandate was approved by the legislature. 15 B. Except as provided in Subsection C of this Section, a legislative mandate 16 to produce any report required of an executive branch agency first occurring on or 17 before June 30, 2018, shall expire on the July first following June 30, 2019, in the 18 earliest year that is a multiple of five years after the mandate was initially approved 19 by the legislature. Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-28 ENGROSSED HB NO. 6 1 C. The standing committees having jurisdiction over the agency tasked with 2 producing the report may extend the mandate for an additional five years by an 3 affirmative vote of the majority of each committee at any time before the July first 4 on which the mandate is set to expire. 5 D. The Not later than January 1, 2022, and every fourth year thereafter, each 6 executive branch agency tasked with producing the report required by law to produce 7 one or more reports shall, not later than the January first immediately preceding the 8 expiration date, notify the committees of the pending expiration of the mandate via 9 electronic mail. The notification submit to the speaker of the House of 10 Representatives and the president of the Senate a notice which shall include at a 11 minimum the following for each report: 12 (1) a A citation of the original mandate law requiring the agency to produce 13 the report, a copy of the most recent report, and. 14 (2) an An estimate of the agency resources including costs expended in 15 producing the report. 16 (3) A determination regarding the continued necessity of the report. 17 B. The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president of the 18 Senate shall each promptly forward the notice to the appropriate standing committee 19 of his house. If the speaker of the House of Representatives or the president of the 20 Senate determines that the notice contains one or more reports that should be 21 reviewed by different standing committees of his house, he shall promptly notify in 22 writing the appropriate standing committees of this determination and forward the 23 notice to the standing committees. 24 C. Each standing committee that receives a notice shall evaluate the 25 necessity for the continuation of the requirement for the agency to produce the 26 report. The standing committees of the two houses performing the evaluation of the 27 same report may meet jointly to perform the evaluation. If a standing committee 28 finds that a requirement to produce a report should terminate, the committee shall 29 cause legislation to be introduced to repeal the requirement. Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-28 ENGROSSED HB NO. 6 1 Section 2. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not 2signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature 3by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If 4vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become 5effective on the day following such approval. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 6 Engrossed 2020 Regular Session Gregory Miller Abstract: Repeals provisions providing for the automatic expiration of requirements for reports by executive branch agencies and instead requires evaluation of the necessity for the reports by standing committees of the legislature. Present law (R.S. 49:1401) provides that a legislative mandate for an executive branch agency to produce a report expires five years after legislative approval of the mandate. Requires the producing agency to notify the legislature of the impending expiration. Authorizes the standing committee with jurisdiction over the producing agency to extend a mandate for an additional five years. Provides for the first reports to expire July 1, 2019. Proposed law repeals present law. Present law requires the executive branch agency tasked with producing a report to notify the committees of the pending expiration of the mandate no later than the Jan. 1st immediately preceding the expiration date. Requires the notification to include at a minimum a citation of the original mandate requiring the report, a copy of the most recent report, and an estimate of the agency resources including costs expended in producing the report. Proposed law instead requires each executive branch agency required by law to produce one or more reports to submit a notice to the speaker of the House of Representatives and the president of the Senate. Requires the notice to be submitted no later than Jan. 1, 2022, and every fourth year thereafter. Requires the notice to include at a minimum a citation of the law requiring the agency to produce the report, an estimate of the agency resources including costs expended in producing the report, and a determination regarding the continued necessity of the report. Proposed law requires the speaker and the president to each promptly forward the notice to the appropriate standing committee or committees of his house. Proposed law requires each standing committee that receives a notice to evaluate the necessity for the continuation of the requirement for the agency to produce the report. If a standing committee finds that a requirement to produce a report should terminate, proposed law requires the committee to cause legislation to be introduced to repeal the requirement. Effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Amends R.S. 49:1401) Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.