Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB669 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 90 (HB 669) 2020 Regular Session	Pierre
Prior law (Sunset) provided that the Dept. of Transportation and Development and all
statutory entities made a part of that department by law must begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2020, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2021, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation and Development
and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2020, in accordance with the "sunset" law.  New
law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and
re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the
department along with additional provisions.  New law makes July 1, 2025, the new
termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2024 unless the department is re-
created again.
Effective June 30, 2020.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(12)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(9)(g))