Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB99 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 20RS-520	REENGROSSED
2020 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 99
BY REPRESENTATIVE MARINO
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Department of Public Safety and Corrections
1	AN ACT
2To enact R.S. 49:191(12)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(9)(a), relative to the Department of
3 Public Safety and Corrections, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of
4 the Department of Public Safety and Corrections and the statutory entities made a
5 part of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all
6 statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for
7 related matters.
8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Public Safety and Corrections
10and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective
11June 30, 2020, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the
12provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
13 Section 2.  All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Public
14Safety and Corrections and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created
15by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2025, pursuant to R.S. 40:191.  However,
16the Department of Public Safety and Corrections may be re-created prior to such date in
17accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised
18Statutes of 1950.
19 Section 3.  The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
20those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
21 Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(12)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 20RS-520	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 99
1 ยง191.  Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-
2	out period for statutory entities; table of dates
3	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
4 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
5 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
6 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
7 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
8	*          *          *
9	(12)  July 1, 2024:
10	*          *          *
11	(b)  The Department of Public Safety and Corrections and all statutory
12 entities made a part of the department by law.
13 Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(9)(a) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
14 Section 6.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2020; if vetoed by the
15governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
16June 30, 2020, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 99 Reengrossed 2020 Regular Session	Marino
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections.
Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations as of July 1, 2020, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease
as of July 1, 2021, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Public Safety and
Corrections and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2020, in accordance with the
"sunset" law.  Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the
procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each
statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions.  Proposed law makes
July 1, 2025, the new termination date and termination would begin on July 1, 2024, unless
the department is re-created again.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 20RS-520	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 99
Effective June 30, 2020.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(12)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(9)(a))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The House Floor Amendments to the engrossed bill:
1. Change the proposed law termination date of July 1, 2027, to July 1, 2025, and
termination would begin on July 1, 2024, rather than July 1, 2026.
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.