Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR22 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 20RS-1207	ORIGINAL
2020 Regular Session
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 22
BY REPRESENTATIVE JAMES
PUBLIC SERVICE COMN:  Urges and requests the Public Service Commission to
temporarily prohibit energy and water companies from disconnecting services
1	A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
2To urge and request the Public Service Commission to prohibit energy and water companies
3 from disconnecting services for a period of three months.
4 WHEREAS, a novel coronavirus named "coronavirus disease 2019", commonly
5referred to as COVID-19, was first detected in Wuhan City, Hubei Province China, in
6December of 2019; and
7 WHEREAS, the coronaviruses are a large family of viruses that are common in
8people and many different animal species; and
9 WHEREAS, COVID-19 is a respiratory illness that has a broad range of symptoms
10from mild, flu-like symptoms to severe breathing difficulties that result in death; and 
11 WHEREAS, the first confirmed instance of person-to-person spread of the virus in
12the United States was recorded on January 30, 2020; and
13 WHEREAS, on the same day the World Health Organization declared the outbreak
14"a public health emergency of international concern"; and 
15 WHEREAS, the rapid spread of COVID-19 lead the World Health Organization to
16upgrade its declaration to a "global pandemic" on March 11, 2020; and 
17 WHEREAS, the first presumptive positive case of COVID-19 in Louisiana occurred
18on March 9, 2020; and
19 WHEREAS, the Governor of Louisiana declared a statewide public health emergency
20on March 11, 2020, due to the risks related to public health associated with the COVID-19
21Coronavirus; and 
Page 1 of 4 HLS 20RS-1207	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 22
1 WHEREAS, presently there is no vaccine to protect against COVID-19, there is a
2high probability of widespread exposure, and the disease poses an imminent threat to
3Louisiana citizens; and
4 WHEREAS, according to the Centers for Disease Control (CDC), "older adults and
5those with severe underlying chronic medical conditions such as heart disease, lung disease,
6or diabetes seem to be at a higher risk for developing more serious complications from the
7COVID-19 illness"; and
8 WHEREAS, the CDC recommends people wash their hands often with soap and
9water for at least twenty seconds, especially after they have been in a public place, or after
10blowing their nose, coughing, or sneezing and also recommends the use of detergent to keep
11items clean; and 
12 WHEREAS, on March 13, 2020, President Donald J. Trump declared a national
13emergency over the COVID-19 Coronavirus outbreak; and
14 WHEREAS, as of March 16, 2020, Louisiana reports 114 COVID-19 cases and two
15deaths from the virus; and
16 WHEREAS, the Public Service Commission is charged with ensuring a regulatory
17balance that enables utilities to provide customers with safe, adequate, and reliable services,
18at rates that are just, reasonable, equitable, and economically efficient; and
19 WHEREAS, the Public Service Commission has jurisdiction over publicly owned
20utilities providing electric, water, waste water, natural gas, and telecommunications services;
21and
22 WHEREAS, in the interest of protecting public health, the Public Service
23Commission should temporarily suspend disconnection of electric or gas service to
24residential customers for nonpayment; and
25 WHEREAS, the impact of the coronavirus in the state could cause economic
26suffering for many, specifically those who become sick or are forced to miss work, which
27also may ultimately result in job loss; and
28 WHEREAS, utility companies in New York agreed to a no-disconnect policy at the
29request of Governor Andrew Cuomo and the New York State Department of Public Service;
30and
Page 2 of 4 HLS 20RS-1207	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 22
1 WHEREAS, major private water companies in New York also agreed to suspend
2shut-offs during the pandemic; and
3 WHEREAS, on March 13, 2020, the West Virginia Public Service Commission
4urged all public utility companies in the state to suspend service terminations effective
5immediately, with exceptions for safety and customer requests; and
6 WHEREAS, in the past, when Louisiana has experienced severe temperatures during
7both the winter summer months, electric and gas companies suspended service terminations
8for nonpayment in the interest of public safety and health; and
9 WHEREAS, similar actions were taken after Hurricane Katrina impacted Louisiana;
10and
11 WHEREAS, the COVID-19 pandemic has already created financial burdens for
12many residents of Louisiana and those burdens may continue increasing for the
13disadvantaged; and 
14 WHEREAS, suspending utility disconnections and decreasing the financial impact
15that residents may face will alleviate much of the inevitable financial stress that will result
16from the COVID-19 Coronavirus; and 
17 WHEREAS, in the interest of public safety and preventing the spread of COVID-19
18and given the severity of the COVID-19 Coronavirus and the uncertainty surrounding the 
19impact it may have on Louisiana residents, the Public Service Commission should prohibit
20the suspension of utility services to ensure that those enduring financial strain and those
21members of disadvantaged communities will not have concerns about keeping critical utility
22services connected.  
23 THEREFORE BE IT RESOLVED, that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
24urge and request the Public Service Commission to prohibit energy and water companies
25from disconnecting utility services for a period of three months.
26 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
27secretary of the Public Service Commission.
Page 3 of 4 HLS 20RS-1207	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 22
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HCR 22 Original 2020 Regular Session	James
Urges and requests the Public Service Commission to prohibit energy and water companies
from disconnecting utility services for a period of three months.
Page 4 of 4