Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR39 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 20RS-1336	ORIGINAL
2020 Regular Session
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 39
BY REPRESENTATIVE BISHOP
GAMBLING/VIDEO POKER:  Temporarily suspends the payment of video draw poker
device operation fees due to the closure of licensed establishments as a result of
COVID-19
1	A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
2To suspend until October 1, 2020, the provisions of R.S. 27:435(A)(5), relative to the
3 payment of device operation fees by owners of video draw poker devices.
4 WHEREAS, R.S. 27:435(A)(5) provides for an operation fee to be paid by owners
5of video draw poker devices and provides that such fee shall be levied for each video draw
6poker device placed by the device owner at a licensed establishment; and
7 WHEREAS, depending on the licensed establishment, operation fees vary from two 
8hundred and fifty dollars per device for bars and restaurants and up to one thousand two
9hundred fifty dollars per device for a race track; and
10 WHEREAS, video draw poker device owners are authorized to pay operational fees
11quarterly and such quarterly payments are due before the tenth day of the month that begins
12a new calendar quarter; and
13 WHEREAS, in response to the COVID-19 pandemic in the state of Louisiana,
14Governor Edwards issued Proclamation Number JBE 2020-30, which required, for the health
15and safety of the public, that video draw  poker establishments cease operations completely
16and that truck stops cease all gaming operations from March 17, 2020, until April 13, 2020;
17and
18 WHEREAS, since March 17, 2020, and until video draw poker establishments are
19authorized to reopen to customers and devices can be operated, there will be no revenue
20generated by the operation of video draw poker devices; and
Page 1 of 2 HLS 20RS-1336	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 39
1 WHEREAS, operation fees will be due on April 10, 2020, for the second quarter of
22020, at a time when video draw poker devices are not allowed to operate, and depending
3on the success of the measures taken to address the health and safety of the public, the
4restriction on the operation of video draw poker devices may be further extended; and
5 WHEREAS, to help businesses that complied with the governor's executive order
6financially survive the COVID-19 pandemic for the period of time when video draw poker
7establishments were required to cease operations and to prevent business owners from
8having to pay a fee for the operation of video draw poker devices, it is necessary to
9temporarily suspend operational fees on video draw poker devices.
10 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana hereby suspends
11the provisions of R.S. 27:435(A)(5).
12 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that this suspension shall become effective upon
13adoption of this Resolution and shall extend through September 30, 2020.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HCR 39 Original 2020 Regular Session	Bishop
Suspends until Oct. 1, 2020, the provisions of R.S. 27:435(A)(5), the payment of device
operation fees by owners of video draw poker devices.
Present law (R.S. 27:435(A)(5)) provides for an annual fee on video draw poker devices, per
device, based on the licensed establishment where the device is located.  Provides for the
following fees for devices located at a licensed establishment that is:
(1)A restaurant, bar, tavern, cocktail lounge, club, motel, or hotel - $250.
(2)A race track - $1,250.
(3)An offtrack wagering facility - $1,000.
(4)A qualified truck stop facility - $1,000.
Present law authorizes the payment of operation fees to be made quarterly, due by the tenth
day of the first month of each calender quarter.
Suspends present law until Oct. 1, 2020.
(Suspends R.S. 27:435(A)(5))
Page 2 of 2