HLS 20RS-1484 ORIGINAL 2020 Regular Session HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 72 BY REPRESENTATIVE SEABAUGH TAX/STATE: Suspends individual and corporate income taxes; income taxes on estates or trusts; corporation franchise taxes, including the initial tax levied on certain corporations and entities; state sales and use taxes; severance taxes; and state excise taxes levied on alcoholic beverages, tobacco products, gasoline, diesel fuels, and special fuels for a certain period of time 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2To suspend until September 1, 2020, the state tax levied on individual income pursuant to 3 R.S. 47:31; the state tax levied on corporations and other entities pursuant to R.S. 4 47:287.11; the state tax levied on income from estates or trusts pursuant to R.S. 5 47:300.1; the state corporation franchise tax levied on domestic and foreign 6 corporations pursuant to R.S. 47:601(A), including the initial tax levied on 7 corporations or other entities for the first accounting period in which the entity 8 becomes subject to the corporation franchise tax pursuant to R.S. 47:611(A); the 9 state tax levied on natural resources severed from the soil or water pursuant to R.S. 10 47:631; the state tax levied on the sale at retail, use, consumption, distribution, and 11 storage for use or consumption of items of tangible personal property or the lease or 12 rental of items of tangible personal property pursuant to R.S. 47:302(A) and (B), 13 321(A) and (B), 321.1(A) and (B), and 331(A) and (B); the state tax levied on 14 gasoline and diesel fuel pursuant to R.S. 47:818.12(A) and (B) and 820.1(A); the 15 state tax levied on special fuels, including compressed natural gas, liquified natural 16 gas, and liquified petroleum gas, pursuant to R.S. 47:818.111(A) and 820.1(A); the 17 state tax levied on the sale, use, consumption, handling, or distribution of cigars, 18 cigarettes, smoking and smokeless tobacco, vapor products, and electronic cigarettes 19 pursuant to R.S. 47:841(A), (B), (C), (E), and (F); the state tax levied on beverages Page 1 of 4 HLS 20RS-1484 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 72 1 of high alcoholic content pursuant to R.S. 26:341(A)(1) through (4); and the state tax 2 levied on beverages of low alcoholic content pursuant to R.S. 26:342. 3 WHEREAS, a novel coronavirus named "coronavirus disease 2019", commonly 4referred to as COVID-19, was first detected in December of 2019; and 5 WHEREAS, On March 11, 2020, Governor John Bel Edwards issued Emergency 6Proclamation Number 25 JBE 2020, which declared a statewide public health emergency as 7a result of the imminent threat posed to Louisiana citizens by the outbreak of a respiratory 8disease caused by a novel coronavirus known commonly as COVID-19, and on March 13, 92020, the governor issued Emergency Proclamation Number 27 JBE 2020, which imposed 10additional restrictions in order to further protect the health and safety of the public because 11of COVID-19; and 12 WHEREAS, on March 22, 2020, the governor issued Emergency Proclamation 13Number 33 JBE 2020 which implemented additional measures, including a general 14stay-at-home order to the public and the temporary closure of certain businesses and further 15limiting the operations of certain non-essential businesses to the public to mitigate the 16impact of COVID-19, and to disrupt the spread of the virus; and 17 WHEREAS, the governor of Louisiana has extended his emergency disaster 18declaration and stay-at-home order until May 15, 2020; and 19 WHEREAS, the president of the United States has shared federal guidelines for 20restarting the economy; and 21 WHEREAS, federal agencies are developing guidelines for restarting the economy; 22and 23 WHEREAS, the economic shutdown which has resulted from the stay-at-home order 24and the temporary closure of certain businesses and the further limiting of the operations of 25certain non-essential businesses to the public contained in the governor's emergency disaster 26declaration have resulted in substantial economic loss and historic unemployment numbers 27for the people of Louisiana; and 28 WHEREAS, in an effort to mitigate some of the financial losses suffered by 29businesses, the state should consider temporarily suspending state taxes imposed on Page 2 of 4 HLS 20RS-1484 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 72 1individuals, businesses, and corporations in order to provide economic relief to individual 2and corporate taxpayers. 3 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana hereby suspends 4the state tax levied on individual income pursuant to R.S. 47:31; the state tax levied on 5corporations and other entities pursuant to R.S. 47:287.11; the state tax levied on income 6from estates or trusts pursuant to R.S. 47:300.1; the state corporation franchise tax levied on 7domestic and foreign corporations pursuant to R.S. 47:601(A), including the initial tax levied 8on corporations or other entities for the first accounting period in which the entity becomes 9subject to the corporation franchise tax pursuant to R.S. 47:611(A); the state tax levied on 10natural resources severed from the soil or water pursuant to R.S. 47:631; the state tax levied 11on the sale at retail, use, consumption, distribution, and storage for use or consumption of 12items of tangible personal property or the lease or rental of items of tangible personal 13property pursuant to R.S. 47:302(A) and (B), 321(A) and (B), 321.1(A) and (B), and 331(A) 14and (B); the state tax levied on gasoline and diesel fuel pursuant to R.S. 47:818.12(A) and 15(B) and 820.1(A); the state tax levied on special fuels, including compressed natural gas, 16liquified natural gas, and liquified petroleum gas, pursuant to R.S. 47:818.111(A) and 17820.1(A); the state tax levied on the sale, use, consumption, handling, or distribution of 18cigars, cigarettes, smoking and smokeless tobacco, vapor products, and electronic cigarettes 19pursuant to R.S. 47:841(A), (B), (C), (E), and (F); the state tax levied on beverages of high 20alcoholic content pursuant to R.S. 26:341(A)(1) through (4); and the state tax levied on 21beverages of low alcoholic content pursuant to R.S. 26:342. 22 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that this suspension shall become effective June 1, 232020, and shall extend through August 31, 2020. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HCR 72 Original 2020 Regular Session Seabaugh Suspends, from June 1, 2020, until Sep. 1, 2020, the state income tax levied on individuals, corporations, and other entities; the state tax levied on income from estates or trusts; the state corporation franchise tax, including the initial tax levied on corporations or other entities for the first accounting period in which the entity becomes subject to the corporation franchise tax; the state tax on natural resources severed from the soil or water; the state sales and use Page 3 of 4 HLS 20RS-1484 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 72 taxes; the state tax on gasoline, diesel, and special fuels, including compressed natural gas, liquified natural gas, and liquified petroleum gas; the state tax on cigars, cigarettes, smoking and smokeless tobacco, vapor products, and electronic cigarettes; and the state tax levied on beverages of high alcoholic content and low alcoholic content. (Suspends R.S. 26:341(A)(1)-(4) and 342, R.S. 47:31, 287.11, 300.1, 302(A) and (B), 321(A) and (B), 321.1(A) and (B), 331(A) and (B), 601(A), 611(A), 631, 818.12(A) and (B), 818.111(A), 820.1(A), and 841(A), (B), (C), (E), and (F)) Page 4 of 4