Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB313 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 20RS-572	ORIGINAL
2020 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 313
BY SENATOR PETERSON 
LOCAL AGENCIES.  Provides relative to exemptions related to the New Orleans Sewerage
and Water Board. (gov sig)
1	AN ACT
2 To enact R.S. 33:4096(A)(1)(c)(iv), relative to the Sewerage and Water Board of New
3 Orleans; to provide relative to exemptions related to the Orleans Parish School
4 Board; and to provide for related matters.
5	Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published.
6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 33:4096(A)(1)(c)(iv) is enacted to read as follows:
8 ยง4096. New Orleans sewerage and water board; water rates; water revenue bonds
9	A.(1) The Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans shall fix the rates to
10 be charged consumers of water, including the power to exceed the total rates in force
11 on November 1, 1913, and shall collect the same from all persons who use water
12 from the public water supply except that:
13	*          *          *
14	(c) The Orleans Parish School Board shall be exempt as follows:
15	*          *          *
16	(iv) Notwithstanding any provisions of law to the contrary, the exemption
17 outlined in this Subsection may be superceded by a mutually agreed upon and
Page 1 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 313
SLS 20RS-572	ORIGINAL
1 executed cooperative endeavor agreement between the Sewerage and Water
2 Board of New Orleans and the Orleans Parish School Board, wherein the terms
3 of the cooperative endeavor agreement shall govern the rate and means by
4 which public schools in Orleans Parish are charged for water and sewer
5 services.
6	*          *          *
7 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not
8 signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature
9 by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If
10 vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become
11 effective on the day following such approval.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by James Benton.
DIGEST
SB 313 Original 2020 Regular Session	Peterson
Present law provides that the Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans will fix the rates
to be charged consumers of water, including the power to exceed the total rates in force on
November 1, 1913, and will collect the same from all persons who use water from the public
water supply except that the Orleans Parish School Board will be exempt as follows:
(1)Those Orleans Parish School Board accounts which are presently exempt will be
exempt from said charges through June 30, 1992.
(2)Effective July 1, 1992 through June 30, 1993, each school campus and each
nonschool facility of the Orleans Parish School Board will be exempt for all water
consumed which does not exceed six gallons per day, for the 365 days of that year,
for each student enrolled and any other person regularly assigned to that campus or
facility within 30 school days of the commencement of the school year. Effective
July 1, 1993, and thereafter, each school campus and each nonschool facility of the
Orleans Parish School Board will be exempt from said charges for all water
consumed which does not exceed four gallons per day, per 365 days a year for each
student enrolled and any other person regularly assigned to that campus or facility
within 30 school days of the commencement of the school year. Effective July 1,
1993, and thereafter, the Orleans Parish School Board also will be exempt from all
water service charges.
(3)The above exemption is determined by the student/employee census report or
equivalent as submitted to the state Department of Education. If said report is
discontinued, a similar report will substitute.
Proposed law retains present law but adds an additional exemption which provides that the
exemption outlined in present law may be superceded by a mutually agreed upon and
executed cooperative endeavor agreement between the Sewerage and Water Board of New
Orleans and the Orleans Parish School Board, wherein the terms of the cooperative endeavor
Page 2 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 313
SLS 20RS-572	ORIGINAL
agreement will govern the rate and means by which public schools in Orleans Parish are
charged for water and sewer services.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Adds R.S. 33:4096(A)(1)(c)(iv))
Page 3 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.