Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB313 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 120 (SB 313) 2020 Regular Session	Peterson
Prior law provided that the Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans will fix the rates to
be charged consumers of water, including the power to exceed the total rates in force on
November 1, 1913, and will collect the same from all persons who use water from the public
water supply except that the Orleans Parish School Board will be exempt as follows:
(1)Those Orleans Parish School Board accounts which are presently exempt will be
exempt from said charges through June 30, 1992.
(2)Effective July 1, 1992 through June 30, 1993, each school campus and each
nonschool facility of the Orleans Parish School Board will be exempt for all water
consumed which does not exceed six gallons per day, for the 365 days of that year,
for each student enrolled and any other person regularly assigned to that campus or
facility within 30 school days of the commencement of the school year. Effective July
1, 1993, and thereafter, each school campus and each nonschool facility of the
Orleans Parish School Board will be exempt from said charges for all water
consumed which does not exceed four gallons per day, per 365 days a year for each
student enrolled and any other person regularly assigned to that campus or facility
within 30 school days of the commencement of the school year. Effective
July 1, 1993, and thereafter, the Orleans Parish School Board also will be exempt
from all water service charges.
(3)The above exemption is determined by the student/employee census report or
equivalent as submitted to the state Department of Education. If said report is
discontinued, a similar report will substitute.
New law retains prior law but adds an additional exemption which provides that the
exemption outlined in prior law may be superceded by a mutually agreed upon and executed
cooperative endeavor agreement between the Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans and
the Orleans Parish School Board, wherein the terms of the cooperative endeavor agreement
will govern the rate and means by which public schools in Orleans Parish are charged for
water and sewer services.
Effective upon signature of the governor (June 9, 2020).
(Adds R.S. 33:4096(A)(1)(c)(iv))