Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR5 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 20RS-41	ORIGINAL
2020 Regular Session
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 5
BY SENATOR BOUDREAUX 
COMMENDATIONS.  Commends Sergeant Major Anazia M. Andrus-Sam on 31 years of
active federal service in the United States Army and United States Army Reserve.
1	A RESOLUTION
2 To commend Sergeant Major Anazia M. Andrus-Sam on thirty-one years of outstanding and
3 selfless service to her country in the United States Army and the United States Army
4 Reserve.
5 WHEREAS, Sergeant Major Andrus-Sam was born in Lafayette, Louisiana, on
6 September 13, 1969, and she graduated from Northside High School in Lafayette in
7 May 1987; and
8 WHEREAS, on January 18, 1989, Anazia Andrus-Sam enlisted in the United States
9 Army and, in March 1989, she began her training at Quartermaster School in Fort Lee,
10 Virginia, followed by training at the Quartermaster Academy, also at Fort Lee, where she
11 received a certification in Petroleum Operations before moving on to Fort Dix, New Jersey,
12 to complete a course in Driver Training and Vehicle Maintenance in July 1989; and
13 WHEREAS, Andrus-Sam's first nontraining assignment was as a petroleum handler
14 with the 305th Supply & Service Company in South Korea where she spent a year from
15 August 1989 through August 1990 when she returned stateside and was assigned to Fort
16 Collins, Colorado, where she continued her duties as an air and fuel handler; and
17 WHEREAS, through these multiple assignments, Anazia Andrus-Sam was promoted
18 several times, including achieving the rank of Sergeant (SGT) in August 1994, Staff
Page 1 of 3 SR NO. 5
SLS 20RS-41	ORIGINAL
1 Sergeant (SSG) in the U.S. Army Reserve in August 1998, Sergeant First Class (SFC) in
2 October 2001, Master Sergeant (MSG) in May 2008, and her final rank of Sergeant Major
3 (SGM) was achieved on June 1, 2017; and
4 WHEREAS, through her numerous assignments in service of her country, Anazia
5 Andrus-Sam has earned and been awarded numerous medals and awards for her meritorious
6 service, including the following: Meritorious Service Medal with One Bronze Oak Leaf
7 Cluster, Army Commendation Medal with One Silver and Two Bronze Oak Leaf Cluster,
8 Army Achievement Medal with One Silver Oak Leaf Cluster, Army Good Conduct Medal
9 with One Silver and Three Bronze Oak Leaf Cluster, National Defense Service Medal with
10 Bronze Star Device, Humanitarian Award, Iraq Campaign Medal, Global War on Terrorism
11 Expeditionary Medal, Global War on Terrorism Service Medal, Armed Forces Reserve
12 Medal with Hourglass and "M" Device, Non Commissioned Officer's Professional
13 Development Ribbon (5), Army Service Ribbon, Overseas Service Ribbon (3), Air Assault
14 Badge, and the Drivers Badge; and
15 WHEREAS, transitioning to service in the United States Army Reserve (USAR) in
16 June 1999, SSG Andrus-Sam was assigned as a petroleum handler at Fort Campbell,
17 Kentucky, on a nonactive status; and
18 WHEREAS, in November 1999, 1SG Andrus-Sam took an active duty USAR
19 assignment to the 465th Quartermaster Company Training command as a training NCO at
20 the facility in Jasper, Alabama, where she was assigned until September 2007; and
21 WHEREAS, from September 2001 through October 2008, Anazia Andrus-Sam was
22 assigned to the First Battalion, 378th Regimental Brigade in Lafayette, Louisiana, as an
23 Operations Non Commissioned Officer (NCO), and during that duty assignment, she
24 attained the rank of MSG; and 
25 WHEREAS, following the assignment in Lafayette, MSG Andrus-Sam served with
26 the 75th Training Command as Operations NCO and in May 2010, she was named Assistant
27 Inspector General of that command; and
28 WHEREAS, from March 2013 through June 2015, MSG Andrus-Sam served as
29 Operations NCO at the 359th Transportation Battalion at Fort Eustis, Virginia; and
30 WHEREAS, in July 2015, SGM Anazia Andrus-Sam was chosen to attend the U.S.
Page 2 of 3 SR NO. 5
SLS 20RS-41	ORIGINAL
1 Army Sergeants Major Academy, acknowledged by both military and civilian organizations
2 as the world's premier institution for the education of NCO's, which was established at Fort
3 Bliss, Texas, on July 1, 1972, and where Andrus-Sam attained the rank of Sergeant Major;
4 and
5 WHEREAS, currently, SGM Andrus-Sam is serving with Military Surface
6 Deployment and Distribution Command at Scott Air Force Base in Illinois; and
7 WHEREAS, throughout her more than thirty-one year career with the United States
8 Army and United States Army Reserve, SGM Anazia Andrus-Sam has demonstrated
9 exceptional commitment to duty and service, having served during both the Iraq Campaign
10 and the Global War on Terrorism, at a time when her country has relied on the willingness
11 of Americans to volunteer to serve in the armed forces in the face of both old and new
12 threats from around the world and Andrus-Sam has contributed to the guarding of this
13 nation's present and future in a manner that only brings credit to her ability and willingness
14 to serve and invokes the gratitude and respect of her fellow Louisianians and, indeed, all
15 Americans.
16 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
17 does hereby commend Sergeant Major Anazia M. Andrus-Sam on thirty-one years of
18 outstanding and selfless service to her country in the United States Army and the United
19 States Army Reserve.
20 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
21 Sergeant Major Anazia M. Andrus-Sam.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Mary Dozier O'Brien.
DIGEST
SR 5 Original	2020 Regular Session	Boudreaux
Commends Sergeant Major Anazia M. Andrus-Sam on 31 years of outstanding and selfless
service to her country in the United States Army and the United States Army Reserve.
Page 3 of 3