Louisiana 2021 2021 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB198 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 21RS-522	REENGROSSED
2021 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 198
BY REPRESENTATIVE PIERRE
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
MTR VEHICLE/LICEN PLATES:  Provides relative to Louisiana vehicle license plates
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:463(A)(3)(a) and (c) and to enact R.S. 47:462(D), relative to
3 Louisiana vehicle license plates; to require the inclusion of the Louisiana tourism
4 website on license plates; and to provide for related matters.
5Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
6 Section 1.  R.S. 47:463(A)(3)(a) and (c) are hereby amended and reenacted and R.S.
747:462(D) is hereby enacted to read as follows:
8 §462.  Trucks and trailers
9	*          *          *
10	D.  The secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Corrections shall
11 issue one uniform identifiable license plate for privately owned personal trucks,
12 commonly referred to as pick-up trucks, which shall contain the phrase "Sportsman's
13 Paradise" imprinted on the bottom and shall contain the Louisiana tourism website,
14 "LouisianaTravel.com".  A plate shall be issued in accordance with the provisions
15 of this Subsection for all new registrations after January 1, 2022.
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 21RS-522	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 198
1 §463.  Private passenger vehicles; amputee veterans exempted; church, church
2	school, and religious order vehicles
3	A.
4	*          *          *
5	(3)(a)  The deputy secretary of the Department of Public Safety and
6 Corrections, public safety services, shall issue license plates for private passenger
7 vehicles.  After July 1, 1992 2021, there shall be issued one uniform identifiable
8 Louisiana license plate, the style of which shall be proposed by the department and
9 approved by the legislature on or before July 1, 1992 2021.  The Louisiana license
10 plate design shall include the Louisiana tourism website, with the word
11 "LouisianaTravel.com" imprinted on the license plate.  However, all special prestige
12 license plates issued in accordance with R.S. 47:463.6 et seq. shall contain the
13 uniform alpha-numeric series accompanied by a symbol or emblem representing the
14 organization requesting such plate, and, on and after January 1, 2019, the
15 international symbol of accessibility, upon request, if the applicant is eligible in
16 accordance with the provisions of R.S. 47:463.4.  All prestige license plates issued
17 after August 15, 1999, shall include a handling charge of three dollars and fifty cents
18 to offset the administrative costs of the department for the issuance of such plates.
19	*          *          *
20	(c)  The secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Corrections shall
21 issue one uniform identifiable license plate for privately owned personal trucks,
22 commonly referred to as pick-up trucks, which shall contain the phrase "Sportsman's
23 Paradise" imprinted on the bottom and shall contain the Louisiana tourism website,
24 "LouisianaTravel.com".  A plate shall be issued in accordance with the provisions
25 of this Subparagraph for all new registrations after January 1, 2004 2022.
26	*          *          *
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 21RS-522	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 198
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 198 Reengrossed 2021 Regular Session	Pierre
Abstract:  Requires the Louisiana license plate to include the Louisiana tourism website,
"LouisianaTravel.com".
Present law requires the deputy secretary of the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections
(DPS&C), public safety services, to issue one uniform identifiable La. license plate for
private passenger vehicles.  Present law requires the style of the license plate to be proposed
by the department and approved by the legislature on or before July 1, 1992.
Proposed law modifies present law by requiring the style to be proposed by the department
and approved by the legislature on or before July 1, 2021.
Present law requires all special prestige license plates contain the uniform alpha-numeric
series accompanied by a symbol or emblem representing the organization requesting the
plate and, if requested and eligible in accordance with present law, requires the international
symbol of accessability on or after Jan. 1, 2019.  Present law requires all prestige license
plates issued after Aug. 15, 1999, include a handling charge of $3.50 to offset the
administrative costs of the DPS&C for the issuance of such plates.
Proposed law retains present law and requires the La. license plate include the La. tourism
website, LouisianaTravel.com.
Present law requires the secretary of the DPS&C to issue one uniform identifiable license
plate for privately owned personal trucks to contain the phrase "Sportsman's Paradise"
imprinted on the bottom.  Present law requires the license plate be issued in accordance with
present law for all new registrations after Jan. 1, 2004.
Present law authorizes any truck having a gross weight of not more than 16,000 lbs, which
is registered in the state and not registered under the International Registration Plan, to have
a prestige license plate authorized pursuant to present law.
Proposed law retains present law and requires the La. tourism website,
"LouisianaTravel.com", be contained on one uniform identifiable license plate for privately
owned personal trucks.  Modifies the effective date for all new registrations to be in
compliance with present law to after Jan. 1, 2022.
(Amends R.S. 47:463(A)(3)(a) and (c); Adds R.S. 47:462(D))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The House Floor Amendments to the engrossed bill:
1. Add a provision that specifies the Louisiana tourism website,
"LouisianaTravel.com", be contained along with the words "Sportsman's
Paradise", on one uniform identifiable license plate, including special prestige
plates, for privately owned personal trucks having a gross weight of not more
than 16,000 lbs.
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.