Louisiana 2021 2021 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB198 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 198 Engrossed	2021 Regular Session	Pierre
Abstract:  Requires the Louisiana license plate to include the Louisiana tourism website,
"LouisianaTravel.com".
Present law requires the deputy secretary of the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections (DPS&C),
public safety services, to issue one uniform identifiable La. license plate for private passenger
vehicles.  Present law requires the style of the license plate to be proposed by the department and
approved by the legislature on or before July 1, 1992.
Proposed law modifies present law by requiring the style to be proposed by the department and
approved by the legislature on or before July 1, 2021.
Present law requires all special prestige license plates contain the uniform alpha-numeric series
accompanied by a symbol or emblem representing the organization requesting the plate and, if
requested and eligible in accordance with present law, requires the international symbol of
accessability on or after Jan. 1, 2019.  Present law requires all prestige license plates issued after
Aug. 15, 1999, include a handling charge of $3.50 to offset the administrative costs of the DPS&C
for the issuance of such plates.
Proposed law retains present law and requires the La. license plate to include the La. tourism
website, LouisianaTravel.com.
Present law requires the secretary of the DPS&C to issue one uniform identifiable license plate for
privately owned personal trucks to contain the phrase "Sportsman's Paradise" imprinted on the
bottom.  Present law requires the license plate be issued in accordance with present law for all new
registrations after Jan. 1, 2004.
Proposed law retains present law and requires the La. tourism website, "LouisianaTravel.com", be
contained on one uniform identifiable license plate for privately owned personal trucks. Modifies
the effective date for all new registrations to be in compliance with present law to after Jan. 1, 2022.
(Amends R.S. 47:463(A)(3)(a) and (c))