Louisiana 2021 2021 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR118 Enrolled / Bill

                    ENROLLED
2021 Regular Session
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 118
BY REPRESENTATIVE CARPENTER
A RESOLUTION
To create a task force to study and make recommendations for implementing a state-
mandated paid family and medical leave program for the benefit of Louisiana
workers.
WHEREAS, the United States is the only industrialized nation in the world that does
not mandate access to paid family and medical leave benefits; and 
WHEREAS, during the coronavirus pandemic, the Families First Coronavirus
Response Act was signed into law, and it required certain employers to expand family and
medical leave for specific reasons related to COVID-19; however, those provisions of the
Act expired December 31, 2020; and 
WHEREAS, on March 11, 2021, the American Rescue Plan Act was signed into law
and extended and expanded some provisions, including provisions referring to emergency
paid family leave, of the Family First Coronavirus Response Act from April 1, 2021, through
September 30, 2021; and 
WHEREAS, there is currently federal law that addresses unpaid leave, which is
known as the Family and Medical Leave Act (FMLA), and it requires a business with at least
fifty employees to provide unpaid leave; and
WHEREAS, a comprehensive paid family and medical leave program would
guarantee leave for Louisiana workers, who may need to take temporary and necessary
leave, to care for an ill family member, newborn, or newly adopted or fostered child, to
recover from a serious illness or temporary disability, such as pregnancy, or to address needs
arising from a family member's military service deployment; and 
WHEREAS, the lack of paid family and medical leave presents a challenge for
Louisiana workers who, in some cases, have to continue working, while they are personally
or seriously ill, so they do not risk losing their income; and
Page 1 of 4 HR NO. 118	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, another challenge Louisiana workers might face is that, in some cases,
they may not be able to take care of family members who are seriously ill or take care of
children because they do not have access to paid family and medical leave and cannot afford
to not work and attend to their loved ones; and 
WHEREAS, Louisiana's infant mortality rate is eight and seven tenths percent per
one thousand live births, which is the second highest in the nation, and Louisiana's maternal
mortality rate is fifty-eight and one tenth percent per one hundred thousand deaths, which
is the highest in the nation; and 
WHEREAS, one huge benefit of paid family and medical leave contended by
proponents is that paid family and medical leave may decrease incidents of low birthweight
and preterm births, reduce infant mortality rates, reduce rates of hospitalization among
infants, reduce maternal mortality rates, and improve maternal health; and  
WHEREAS, a paid family and medical leave program would not only benefit
Louisiana workers and their families but also Louisiana employers because Louisiana
employers can also participate in the paid family and medical leave program and utilize
family and medical leave when necessary to take care of themselves and their own family
members; and 
WHEREAS, paid family and medical leave is not only beneficial healthwise, but
could also provide an economic incentive, such as increasing labor force participation and
employee productivity and increasing employee retention; and
WHEREAS, Louisiana prides itself on being a family-first state and implementing
a paid family and medical leave program could provide both a favorable economical impact
to the state and health and financial security for Louisiana workers and their families. 
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the
Legislature of Louisiana does hereby establish the Paid Family and Medical Leave Task
Force to study and make recommendations for implementing a state-mandated paid family
and medical leave program for the benefit of Louisiana workers.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the membership of the task force shall be as
follows:
(1)The secretary of the Louisiana Workforce Commission or his designee.
(2)One representative from the Agenda for Children.
Page 2 of 4 HR NO. 118	ENROLLED
(3)One representative from the Louisiana Association of Self Insured
Employers.
(4)One representative from the Louisiana Home Builders Association.
(5)One representative from the Louisiana Association of Business and Industry.
(6)One representative from the National Federal of Independent Business.
(7)One representative from the New Orleans Maternal and Child Health
Coalition. 
(8)One representative from the Council for a Better Louisiana.
(9)One representative from the Pelican Chapter Associated Builders and
Contractors, Inc.
(10)One representative from the Louisiana Developmental Disabilities Council.
(11)One representative from the Louisiana AFL-CIO.
(12)One representative from the Louisiana Women Lead.
(13)One representative from the Louisiana Mid-Continent Oil and Gas
Association.
(14)One representative from the March of Dimes-Louisiana Chapter.
(15)One representative from the Louisiana Family Forum.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Louisiana Workforce Commission shall
provide staff support as needed by the task force.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that at the first meeting, the members of the task
force shall elect a chairperson, who shall preside over the task force.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that members of the task force shall serve without
compensation.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall convene its first meeting by
September 1, 2021, and shall meet as frequently as it deems necessary for the timely
performance of its duties.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall submit a written report of
its findings and recommendations to the House of Representatives of the Legislature of
Louisiana not later than thirty days prior to the convening of the 2022 Regular Session. 
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall study and make
recommendations on matters that include but are not limited to the following:
Page 3 of 4 HR NO. 118	ENROLLED
(1)Any and all benefits that Louisiana workers could receive if Louisiana
implemented a state-mandated paid family and medical leave program.
(2) The advantages and disadvantages of implementing a state-mandated paid
family and medical leave program.
(3)The mechanisms or measures to provide family and medical leave to self-
employed workers and gig workers.
(4)Who would fund the state-mandated paid family and medical leave program
and how would the program be funded?
(5)What other states, preferably neighboring states, if any, have enacted a state-
mandated paid family and medical leave program?
(6)If implemented, how can Louisiana structure its own state-mandated paid
family and medical leave program?
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
secretary of the Louisiana Workforce Commission, the chief executive officer of the Agenda
for Children, the president of the Louisiana Association of Business and Industry, the
Louisiana state director of the National Federation of Independent Business, the coordinator
of the New Orleans Maternal and Child Health Coalition, the president of the Council for
a Better Louisiana, the chairperson of the Louisiana Developmental Disabilities Council, the
president of the Louisiana AFL-CIO, the executive director of the Louisiana Women Lead,
the president of the March of Dimes-Louisiana Chapter, the president of the Louisiana
Family Forum, and the president of the Louisiana Association of Self Insured Employers,
the president of the Louisiana Home Builders Association, the president of the Pelican
Chapter Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc., and the president of the Louisiana Mid-
Continent Oil and Gas Association.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 4 of 4