HLS 22RS-330 ENGROSSED 2022 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 119 BY REPRESENTATIVE CARPENTER SUNSET LAW: Re-creates the Louisiana Workforce Commission and re-authorizes the Incumbent Worker Training Program 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 23:1553(G) and R.S. 49:191(1) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(10)(l), 3 relative to the Louisiana Workforce Commission, including provisions to provide for 4 the re-creation of the Louisiana Workforce Commission and the statutory entities 5 made a part of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination date 6 for all statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; to provide for 7 the re-authorization of the Incumbent Worker Training Program within the Louisiana 8 Workforce Commission; and to provide for related matters. 9Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 10 Section 1. R.S. 23:1553(G) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 11 §1553. Noncharging of benefits; recoupment; social charge account; social charge 12 tax rate 13 * * * 14 G. The Incumbent Worker Training Program reauthorization shall be 15 expressly renewed by the legislature prior to July 1, 2022 2026, in order for amounts 16 to be charged and credited to the Incumbent Worker Training Account in the 17 following calendar year for use in funding the program. 18 Section 2. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Louisiana Workforce Commission and the 19statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30, Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 22RS-330 ENGROSSED HB NO. 119 12022, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of 2Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 3 Section 3. All statutory authority for the existence of the Louisiana Workforce 4Commission and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 52 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2027, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Louisiana 6Workforce Commission may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the 7provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 8 Section 4. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that 9those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act. 10 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(1) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 11 §191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase- 12 out period for statutory entities; table of dates 13 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the 14 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their 15 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority 16 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of 17 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date: 18 (1) July 1, 2006 2026: 19 (a) The Louisiana Workforce Commission and all statutory entities made a 20 part of the department by law. 21 * * * 22 Section 6. R.S. 49:191(10)(l) is hereby repealed in its entirety. 23 Section 7. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2022; if vetoed by the 24governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on 25June 30, 2022, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 22RS-330 ENGROSSED HB NO. 119 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 119 Engrossed 2022 Regular Session Carpenter Abstract: Re-creates the Louisiana Workforce Commission and re-authorizes the Incumbent Worker Training Program. Present law provides that the Incumbent Worker Training Program (IWTP) re-authorization shall be expressly renewed by the legislature prior to July 1, 2022, in order for amounts to be charged and credited to the Incumbent Worker Training Account in the following calendar year for use in funding the program. Proposed law changes the renewal date for the IWTP re-authorization from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2026. Present law (Sunset) provides that the La. Workforce Commission (LWC) and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate its operations on July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the LWC and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, in accordance with the sunset law. Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2027, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2026, unless the department is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2022. (Amends R.S. 23:1553(G) and R.S. 49:191(1); Repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(l)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by House The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations to the original bill: 1. Make technical changes. Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.