Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB119 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 22RS-330	ENGROSSED
2022 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 119
BY REPRESENTATIVE CARPENTER
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Louisiana Workforce Commission and re-authorizes the
Incumbent Worker Training Program
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 23:1553(G) and R.S. 49:191(1) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(10)(l),
3 relative to the Louisiana Workforce Commission, including provisions to provide for
4 the re-creation of the Louisiana Workforce Commission and the statutory entities
5 made a part of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination date
6 for all statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; to provide for
7 the re-authorization of the Incumbent Worker Training Program within the Louisiana
8 Workforce Commission; and to provide for related matters.
9Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
10 Section 1.  R.S. 23:1553(G) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
11 §1553.  Noncharging of benefits; recoupment; social charge account; social charge
12	tax rate
13	*          *          *
14	G. The Incumbent Worker Training Program reauthorization shall be
15 expressly renewed by the legislature prior to July 1, 2022 2026, in order for amounts
16 to be charged and credited to the Incumbent Worker Training Account in the
17 following calendar year for use in funding the program.
18 Section 2.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Louisiana Workforce Commission and the
19statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 22RS-330	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 119
12022, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of
2Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
3 Section 3.  All statutory authority for the existence of the Louisiana Workforce
4Commission and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section
52 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2027, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Louisiana
6Workforce Commission may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the
7provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
8 Section 4.  The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
9those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
10 Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(1) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
11 §191.  Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-
12	out period for statutory entities; table of dates
13	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
14 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
15 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
16 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
17 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
18	(1)  July 1, 2006 2026:
19	(a)  The Louisiana Workforce Commission and all statutory entities made a
20 part of the department by law.
21	*          *          *
22 Section 6.  R.S. 49:191(10)(l) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
23 Section 7.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2022; if vetoed by the
24governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
25June 30, 2022, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 22RS-330	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 119
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 119 Engrossed 2022 Regular Session	Carpenter
Abstract:  Re-creates the Louisiana Workforce Commission and re-authorizes the
Incumbent Worker Training Program.
Present law provides that the Incumbent Worker Training Program (IWTP) re-authorization
shall be expressly renewed by the legislature prior to July 1, 2022, in order for amounts to
be charged and credited to the Incumbent Worker Training Account in the following
calendar year for use in funding the program.
Proposed law changes the renewal date for the IWTP re-authorization from July 1, 2022, to
July 1, 2026. 
Present law (Sunset) provides that the La. Workforce Commission (LWC) and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate its
operations on July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the LWC and its statutory entities,
effective June 30, 2022, in accordance with the sunset law.
Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for
review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity
within the department along with additional provisions.
Proposed law makes July 1, 2027, the new termination date and termination would begin
July 1, 2026, unless the department is again re-created. 
Effective June 30, 2022. 
(Amends R.S. 23:1553(G) and R.S. 49:191(1); Repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(l))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Labor and Industrial
Relations to the original bill:
1. Make technical changes.
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.