DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 119 Engrossed 2022 Regular Session Carpenter Abstract: Re-creates the Louisiana Workforce Commission and re-authorizes the Incumbent Worker Training Program. Present law provides that the Incumbent Worker Training Program (IWTP) re-authorization shall be expressly renewed by the legislature prior to July 1, 2022, in order for amounts to be charged and credited to the Incumbent Worker Training Account in the following calendar year for use in funding the program. Proposed law changes the renewal date for the IWTP re-authorization from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2026. Present law (Sunset) provides that the La. Workforce Commission (LWC) and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate its operations on July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the LWC and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, in accordance with the sunset law. Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2027, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2026, unless the department is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2022. (Amends R.S. 23:1553(G) and R.S. 49:191(1); Repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(l)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by House The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations to the original bill: 1. Make technical changes.