Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB275 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 22RS-794	ORIGINAL
2022 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 275
BY REPRESENTATIVE BAGLEY
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Department of Children and Family Services
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 49:191(1) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(10)(d), relative to the
3 Department of Children and Family Services , including provisions to provide for the
4 re-creation of the Department of Children and Family Services and the statutory
5 entities made a part of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination
6 date for all statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to
7 provide for related matters.
8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Children and Family Services
10and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective
11June 30, 2022, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the
12provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
13 Section 2.  All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Children and
14Family Services and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by
15Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2027, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the
16Department of Children and Family Services may be re-created prior to such date in
17accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised
18Statutes of 1950.
19 Section 3.  The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
20those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 22RS-794	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 275
1 Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(1) is hereby amended and enacted to read as follows:
2 ยง191.  Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-
3	out period for statutory entities; table of dates
4	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
5 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
6 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
7 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
8 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
9	(1)  July 1, 2006 2026:
10	(a)  The Department of Children and Family Services and all statutory entities
11 made a part of the department by law.
12	*          *          *
13 Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(10)(d) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
14 Section 6.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2022; if vetoed by the
15governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
16June 30, 2022, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 275 Original 2022 Regular Session	Bagley
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Children and Family Services. 
Proposed law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Children and Family Services and all
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto. 
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Children and Family
Services and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, in accordance with the "sunset"
law. 
Proposed law sets out the procedure for review and the re-creation, which requires a separate
bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. 
Proposed law makes July 1, 2027, the new termination date and termination would begin
July 1, 2026, unless the department is again re-created.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 22RS-794	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 275
Effective June 30, 2022. 
(Amends R.S. 49:191(1); Repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(d))
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.