DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 275 Engrossed 2022 Regular Session Bagley Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Children and Family Services. Proposed law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Children and Family Services and all statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Children and Family Services and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Proposed law sets out the procedure for review and the re-creation, which requires a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2027, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2026, unless the department is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2022. (Amends R.S. 49:191(1); Repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(d))