Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB617 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 617 Original	2022 Regular Session	Mincey
Abstract: Creates the Reimagine Accountability Commission to review and report relative to the
school and district accountability system.
Present law provides for a system of school and district accountability based on student achievement
and minimum standards for the approval of schools.  Proposed law creates the Reimagine
Accountability Commission for the purpose of reviewing and reporting relative to the accountability
system.  Provides for 19 members who shall serve without compensation.  Requires the state
superintendent of education or his designee to convene the first meeting not later than July 15, 2022. 
Specifies the issues to be studied and requires submission of a report to the State Bd. of Elementary
and Secondary Education (BESE) and the House and Senate education committees by June 30, 2023,
on which date the commission shall terminate.  Requires BESE to consider the report findings and
recommendations during at least two meetings held at least 30 days apart.  Prohibits, from July 1,
2022, until June 30, 2024, either BESE or the state Dept. of Education from:
(1)Renewing or entering into any contract with any vendor to provide services or content
pertaining to the accountability system that has a term in excess of one fiscal year.
(2)Implementing any changes to any element of the accountability system except those that are
federally mandated or mandated by the legislature.
Effective July 1, 2022, except repeal of proposed law is effective July 1, 2024.
(Adds R.S. 17:10.10 and R.S. 36:651(F)(7); Repeals R.S. 17:10.10 and R.S. 36:651(F)(7))