Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB755 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 22RS-89	ENGROSSED
2022 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 755
BY REPRESENTATIVES SCHEXNAYDER AND Z ERINGUE
FUNDS/FUNDING-GRANTS:  Provides for the disbursement of monies received from the
American Rescue Plan Act of 2021
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 39:100.44.1(B)(4), (E), (H)(3), and (J), relative to the
3 disbursement of monies received from the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021; to
4 make changes to the Louisiana Loggers Relief Program; to provide for an effective
5 date; and to provide for related matters.
6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 39:100.44.1(B)(4), (E), (H)(3), and (J) are hereby amended and
8reenacted to read as follows: 
9 ยง100.44.1.  Louisiana Main Street Recovery Program; Louisiana Rescue Plan Funds;
10	Loggers Relief; Save Our Screens
11	*          *          *
12	B.  Any business receiving funding from a program within the Louisiana
13 Main Street Recovery Program pursuant to this Section shall meet the following
14 criteria:
15	*          *          *
16	(4)(a)  For movie theaters, experienced Experienced a revenue loss of ten
17 percent or greater of gross revenue for the period of January 1, 2020, through
18 December 31, 2020, as compared to the gross revenue of the business during the
19 same period in 2019.
Page 1 of 4
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 22RS-89	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 755
1	(b)  For loggers, experienced a revenue loss of gross revenue for the period
2 of January 1, 2020, through December 31, 2020, as compared to the gross revenue
3 of the business during the same period in 2019.
4	*          *          *
5	E.  The Louisiana Loggers Relief Program shall have priority for ten million
6 dollars of the money granted by the Louisiana Main Street Recovery Program.
7 Grants shall be distributed to eligible timber harvesting and timber hauling
8 businesses impacted by COVID-19.  Any grant received pursuant to this Subsection
9 shall not exceed twenty-five thousand dollars per business. In addition to the criteria
10 provided in Subsection B of this Section, a timber harvesting or timber hauling
11 business shall meet all of the following criteria to be eligible to receive a grant:
12	(1)  Is assigned a North American Industry Classification System Code of
13 113310 or 484220. classified as one of the following Internal Revenue Service
14 Principal Business Activity Codes:
15	(a)  113000, 113110, 113210, 113310, or 115310.
16	(b)  484110, 484120, 484200, or 484220.
17	(2)  Is certified by the Louisiana Forestry Association as a master logger. 
18 headquartered in Louisiana.
19	(3)  Is not a subsidiary of a business with more than fifty full-time equivalent
20 employees, is not part of a larger business enterprise with more than fifty full-time
21 equivalent employees, and is not owned by a business with more than fifty full-time
22 equivalent employees.
23	*          *          *
24	H.
25	*          *          *
26	(3)  Any remaining balance in the fund on June 30, 2022 June 30, 2023, shall
27 be transferred to the Louisiana Rescue Plan Fund.
28	*          *          *
Page 2 of 4
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 22RS-89	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 755
1	J.  No grants shall be awarded pursuant to this Section after January 30, 2022.
2 December 31, 2022.
3	*          *          *
4 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not
5signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature
6by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If
7vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become
8effective on the day following such approval.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 755 Engrossed 2022 Regular Session	Schexnayder
Abstract:  Makes changes to the La. Loggers Relief Program to administer monies from the
American Rescue Plan Act of 2021.
Present law creates the La. Rescue Plan Fund and directs the treasurer to deposit any federal
monies allocated to La. pursuant to the Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund of the
American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 into the fund.
Present law creates the La. Main Street Recovery Rescue Plan Fund and transfers $14.5
million from the La. Rescue Plan Fund into the fund. 
Present law requires any remaining balance in the fund on June 30, 2022, to be transferred
to the La. Rescue Plan Fund.
Proposed law extends the date to June 30, 2023.
Present law creates the La. Loggers Relief Program to provide grants to timber harvesting
and timber hauling businesses who suffered revenue loss due to COVID-19.
Present law establishes the program as a component of the La. Main Street Recovery
Program.
Present law further provides that La. Loggers Relief Program shall have priority for $10
million in the La. Main Street Recovery Rescue Plan Fund.
Present law requires a timber harvesting or timber hauling business to meet certain criteria
to be eligible to receive a grant, including the following:
(1)Experienced a revenue loss of 10% or greater of gross revenue for the period of Jan.
1, 2020, through Dec. 31, 2020, as compared to the gross revenue of the business
during the same period in 2019.
(2)Is assigned a NAICS Code of 113310 or 484220.
Page 3 of 4
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 22RS-89	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 755
(3)Is certified by the La. Forestry Association as a master logger.
Proposed law removes the 10% revenue loss requirement and instead requires the timber
business to have experienced any revenue loss during time frame established in present law.
Proposed law changes the eligible NAICS Codes to corresponding IRS Principal Business
Activity Codes.
Proposed law removes the master logger requirement and instead requires the business to
be headquartered in La.
Present law requires that no grants shall be awarded for the La. Loggers Relief Program after
Jan. 30, 2022. 
Proposed law extends the final grant award date to Dec. 31, 2022.
Effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 39:100.44.1(B)(4), (E), (H)(3), and (J))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Appropriations to the
original bill:
1. Change the effective date of proposed law from Aug. 1 to upon signature of
governor.
Page 4 of 4
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.