DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 755 Original 2022 Regular Session Schexnayder Abstract: Makes changes to the La. Loggers Relief Program to administer monies from the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021. Present law creates the La. Rescue Plan Fund and directs the treasurer to deposit any federal monies allocated to La. pursuant to the Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund of the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 into the fund. Present law creates the La. Main Street Recovery Rescue Plan Fund and transfers $14.5 million from the La. Rescue Plan Fund into the fund. Present law requires any remaining balance in the fund on June 30, 2022, to be transferred to the La. Rescue Plan Fund. Proposed law extends the date to June 30, 2023. Proposed law creates the La. Loggers Relief Program to provide grants to timber harvesting and timber hauling businesses who suffered revenue loss due to COVID-19. Proposed law establishes the program as a component of the La. Main Street Recovery Program. Present law further provides that La. Loggers Relief Program shall have priority for $10 million in the La. Main Street Recovery Rescue Plan Fund. Present law requires a timber harvesting or timber hauling business to meet certain criteria to be eligible to receive a grant, including the following: (1)Experienced a revenue loss of 10% or greater of gross revenue for the period of Jan. 1, 2020, through Dec. 31, 2020, as compared to the gross revenue of the business during the same period in 2019. (2)Is assigned a NAICS Code of 113310 or 484220. (3)Is certified by the La. Forestry Association as a master logger. Proposed law removes the 10% revenue loss requirement and instead requires the timber business to have experienced any revenue loss during time frame established in present law. Proposed law changes the eligible NAICS Codes to corresponding IRS Principal Business Activity Codes. Proposed law removes the master logger requirement and instead requires the business to be headquartered in La. Present law requires that no grants shall be awarded for the La. Loggers Relief Program after Jan. 30, 2022. Proposed law extends the final grant award date to Dec. 31, 2022. (Amends R.S. 39:100.44.1(B)(4), (E), (H)(3), and (J))