Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB755 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    SSHB755 2549 5478
HOUSE SUMMARY OF SENATE AMENDMENTS
HB 755	2022 Regular Session	Schexnayder
FUNDS/FUNDING-GRANTS:  Provides relative to the disbursement of state monies
Synopsis of Senate Amendments
1.Adds provision authorizing supplemental grants through the La. Save Our
Screens Program with funds allocated in proposed law.  Allows a movie theater
business that applied for a grant on or before Jan. 30, 2022, to be eligible for
supplemental grants pursuant to proposed law.  Terminates award of such
supplemental grants on Dec. 31, 2022.  
2.Transfers $497,266 from the La. Rescue Plan Fund into the La. Main Street
Recovery Rescue Plan Fund for supplemental grants through the La. Save Our
Screens Program.
3.Adds provisions specifying that priority shall be given to timber harvesting and
timber handling businesses that previously submitted applications to the La.
Main Street Recovery Program as provided in present law but whose
applications were denied.  
4.Adds provision authorizing $3,000,000 of the monies allocated to the La.
Loggers Relief Program to the La. Agriculture Transportation Group Self-
Insured Fund if Senate Bill No. 437 of the 2022 Regular Session of the
Legislature is enacted and becomes effective.
5.Creates the Political Subdivision Federal Grant Assistance Fund in the state
treasury for use by the Division of Administration for a program to assist
political subdivisions with competitive federal grant opportunities made
pursuant to the Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act.
6.Transfers $25,000,000 from the Capital Outlay Savings Fund into the Political
Subdivision Federal Grant Assistance Fund.
7.Makes technical changes.
Digest of Bill as Finally Passed by Senate
Present law (R.S. 39:100.51) creates the La. Rescue Plan Fund and directs the treasurer to
deposit into the fund any federal monies allocated to La. pursuant to the Coronavirus State
Fiscal Recovery Fund of the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021.
Present law (R.S. 39:100.44.1) creates the La. Main Street Recovery Rescue Plan Fund and
transfers $14.5 million from the La. Rescue Plan Fund into the fund. 
Present law requires any remaining balance in the fund on June 30, 2022, to be transferred
to the La. Rescue Plan Fund.  Proposed law extends the date to June 30, 2023.
Present law creates the La. Loggers Relief Program to provide grants to timber harvesting
and timber hauling businesses who suffered revenue loss due to COVID-19.  Establishes the
program as a component of the La. Main Street Recovery Program.
Present law provides that priority be given to businesses that previously submitted
applications to the La. Main Street Recovery Program as provided in present law, but whose
appications were not considered due to exhaustion of monies in the La. Main Street Recovery
Page 1 of 3 SSHB755 2549 5478
Fund.  Proposed law provides that priority shall be given to timber harvesting and timber
handling businesses that previously submitted applications to the La. Main Street Recovery
Program but whose applications were denied.
Present law further provides that the La. Loggers Relief Program shall have priority for $10
million in the La. Main Street Recovery Rescue Plan Fund.
Present law requires a timber harvesting or timber hauling business to meet certain criteria
to be eligible to receive a grant, including the following:
(1)Experienced a revenue loss of 10% or greater of gross revenue for the period of Jan.
1, 2020, through Dec. 31, 2020, as compared to the gross revenue of the business
during the same period in 2019.
(2)Is assigned a NAICS Code of 113310 or 484220.
(3)Is certified by the La. Forestry Association as a master logger.
Proposed law removes the 10% revenue loss requirement and instead requires the timber
business to have experienced any revenue loss during time frame established in present law.
Proposed law changes the eligible NAICS Codes to corresponding IRS Principal Business
Activity Codes.
Proposed law removes the master logger requirement and instead requires the business to be
headquartered in La.
Present law requires that no grants shall be awarded for the La. Loggers Relief Program after
Jan. 30, 2022. Proposed law extends the final grant award date to Dec. 31, 2022.
Present law establishes the La. Save Our Screens Program to provide grants to movie theaters
in La. impacted by COVID-19.  Establishes the program as a component of the La. Main
Street Recovery Program.
Present law provides that no grants shall be awarded pursuant to the Save Our Screens
Program after Jan. 30, 2022.  Proposed law retains present law.  Further provides that if
supplemental funding for the Program becomes available after Jan. 30, 2022, then
supplemental grants shall be awarded on a pro-rata, per screen basis to all movie theater
businesses that applied for a grant on or before Jan. 30, 2022.  Prohibits awards pursuant to
proposed law after Dec. 31, 2022.
Proposed law (R.S. 39:100.192) establishes the Political Subdivision Federal Grant
Assistance Fund as a special fund in the state treasury.  Provides for the deposit, investment,
and administration of the fund.  Provides that unexpended, unencumbered monies in the fund
at the end of the fiscal year shall remain in the fund.  Further provides that monies in the fund
be used by the division of administration for a program to assist political subdivisions with
competitive federal grant opportunities made pursuant to present federal law (Infrastructure
Investment and Jobs Act).  Requires the program's guidelines to be approved by the Joint
Legislative Committee on the Budget.
Proposed law requires the state treasurer to transfer $497,266 from the La. Rescue Plan Fund
to the La. Main Street Recovery Rescue Plan Fund for the La. Save Our Screens Program.
Proposed law requires the state treasurer to transfer $25,000,000 from the Capital Outlay
Savings Fund to the Political Subdivision Federal Grant Assistance Fund. 
Provisions relating to the La. Agriculture Transportation Group Self-Insured Fund effective
if and when the Act that originated as Senate Bill No. 437 of the 2022 Regular Session of the
Legislature becomes law; remainder effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for
Page 2 of 3 SSHB755 2549 5478
gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 39:100.44.1(B)(4), (D), (E), (H)(3), and (J); Adds R.S. 39:100.44.1(K) and
100.192)
Page 3 of 3