The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Yoursheka Butler. DIGEST SB 107 Engrossed 2022 Regular Session Luneau Present law provides that the Incumbent Worker Training Program (IWTP) re-authorization shall be expressly renewed by the legislature prior to July 1, 2022, in order for amounts to be charged and credited to the Incumbent Worker Training Account in the following calendar year for use in funding the program. Proposed law retains present law but requires the legislature to renew the IWTP re-authorization prior to July 1, 2026. Present law provides that the Louisiana Workforce Commission (LWC) and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate its operations on July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities ceases as of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the LWC and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2027, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2026, unless the department is re-created again. Effective June 30, 2022. (Amends R.S. 23:1553(G); adds R.S. 49:191(13); repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(l))