Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB132 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 22RS-214	ORIGINAL
2022 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 132
BY SENATOR MILLIGAN 
SUNSET LAW.  Re-creates the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency
Preparedness. (6/30/22)
1	AN ACT
2 To enact R.S. 49:191(13)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(10)(m) relative to the Governor's
3 Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness, including provisions to
4 provide for the re-creation of the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and
5 Emergency Preparedness and the statutory entities made a part of the office by law;
6 to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory authority for the
7 existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.
8 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and
10 Emergency Preparedness and the statutory entities made a part of the office by law shall be
11 re-created effective June 30, 2022, and all statutory authority therefore is continued in
12 accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised
13 Statutes of 1950.
14 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Governor's Office of
15 Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness and the statutory entities made a part of
16 the office as re-created by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2027, pursuant to
17 R.S. 49:191. However the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 132
SLS 22RS-214	ORIGINAL
1 Preparedness may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of Part
2 XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
3 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
4 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
5 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(13)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows:
6 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities;
7	phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates
8	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
9 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
10 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
11 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
12 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
13	*          *          *
14	(13) July 1, 2026:
15	(a) The Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency
16 Preparedness and all statutory entities made a part of the office by law.
17 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(10)(m) is hereby repealed.
18 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2022; if vetoed by the
19 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
20 June 30, 2022, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Alan Miller.
DIGEST
SB 132 Original 2022 Regular Session	Milligan
Present law (Sunset law) provides that the GOHSEP and all the statutory entities made a part
of that office by law must begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2022, and that all
legislative authority for such entities must cease as of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature
enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the office and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the re-creation of the GOHSEP and its statutory entities, effective
June 30, 2022, for a four-year period.
Effective June 30, 2022.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(13)(a); repeals R.S. 191(10)(m))
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.