SLS 22RS-155 ORIGINAL 2022 Regular Session SENATE BILL NO. 140 BY SENATOR ABRAHAM SHERIFFS. Provides for insurance benefits for retired sheriffs and deputies of the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. (7/1/22) 1 AN ACT 2 To amend and reenact R.S. 13:5554(G)(4)(c) and to enact R.S. 13:5554(G)(4)(d), (e), (f), 3 and (g), relative to insurance benefits for certain sheriffs and deputies; to provide for 4 eligibility requirements for the payment of insurance premium costs for retired 5 sheriffs and deputies of the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office; and to provide for related 6 matters. 7 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 8 Section 1. R.S. 13:554(G)(4)(c) is amended and reenacted and R.S. 9 13:5554(G)(4)(d), (e), (f), and (g) are hereby enacted to read as follows: 10 ยง5554. Group insurance; kinds; amounts; subrogation 11 * * * 12 G. * * * 13 (4) Notwithstanding the provisions of Paragraph (1) of this Subsection, the 14 sheriff of Acadia Parish shall pay out of the sheriff's general fund the premium costs 15 of group insurance for any sheriff or deputy sheriff who is eligible to receive benefits 16 from the Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund, as follows: 17 * * * Page 1 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 140 SLS 22RS-155 ORIGINAL 1 (c) The provisions of Paragraph (1) of this Subsection, as applicable to the 2 Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office, shall apply to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs retired on 3 or before December 31, 2014. The provisions of Subparagraphs (a) and (b) of this 4 Paragraph shall apply to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs who retire on or after January 1, 5 2015, but before July 1, 2022; however, any sheriff or deputy sheriff who has met 6 the eligibility requirements pursuant to Paragraph (1) of this Subsection, on or before 7 June 30, 2014, may retire at any time with benefits as provided in Paragraph (1) of 8 this Subsection. 9 (d) Notwithstanding the provisions of Paragraph (1) of this Subsection 10 and Subparagraphs (a) through (c) of this Paragraph, one hundred percent of 11 the premium costs of group insurance, hospital, surgical, and medical expense 12 insurance and the first ten thousand dollars of life insurance contracted 13 pursuant to the provisions of this Section shall be paid in full from the sheriff's 14 general fund for any sheriff or full-time deputy sheriff, any other employee who 15 has retired from the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office and who is eligible to receive 16 benefits from the Sheriff's Pension and Relief Fund, and meets the following 17 qualifications: 18 (i) The first twenty-five years of creditable service with a statewide 19 retirement system. 20 (ii) The final twelve continuous years of full-time creditable service with 21 the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. 22 (iii) At least fifty-five years of age. 23 (e) Insurance benefits provided for in Subparagraph (d) of this 24 Paragraph shall be based on the total amount of creditable service with a 25 statewide retirement system including time earned in the Sheriff's Pension and 26 Relief Fund and the recipient's coverage during the last active year of service 27 with the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. Coverage of these insurance benefits 28 shall be extended to the recipient's eligible dependents if the recipient requests 29 such coverage. Page 2 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 140 SLS 22RS-155 ORIGINAL 1 (f) Recipients of insurance pursuant to Subparagraph (d) of this 2 Paragraph are subject to all cost increases or changes to the active insurance 3 plan. 4 (g) The provisions of Subparagraph (d) of this Paragraph shall apply to 5 sheriffs and deputy sheriffs who retire on or after July 1, 2022. 6 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2022; if vetoed by the governor 7 and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on the day 8 following such approval by the legislature or July 1, 2022, whichever is later. The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Alan Miller. DIGEST SB 140 Original 2022 Regular Session Abraham Present law requires that any policy or self-insurance plan providing group hospital, surgical, medical expense, or life insurance contracted for under the provisions of present law contain a provision authorizing any covered employee retiring under his sheriff's department retirement plan to elect to continue such coverage upon retirement. Present law authorizes the premium cost of such coverage to be paid in full or in part from the sheriff's general funds or by the retired employee. Present law requires a uniform policy with respect to the payment of such premiums be formulated and applied by each sheriff. Present law requires the premium costs of group hospital, surgical, medical expense, and dental insurance and the first $10,000 of life insurance contracted for under the provisions of present law be paid in full from the Acadia parish sheriff's general fund for all Acadia parish sheriffs and deputy sheriffs retired with at least 15 years of service who are at least 55 years of age, or retired with at least 30 years of service at any age, on or after January 1, 2015, but before July 1, 2022. Proposed law requires the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office to pay out of the sheriff's general fund 100% of the premium costs of group insurance, hospital, surgical, and medical expense insurance and the first $10,000 of life insurance contracted pursuant to proposed law be paid in full from the sheriff's general fund for any sheriff or full-time deputy sheriff, any other employee who has retired from the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office and who is eligible to receive benefits from the Sheriff's Pension and Relief Fund, and that meets the following qualifications: (1)The first 25 years of service being in a statewide retirement system other than the Sheriff's Pension and Relief Fund. (2)The final 12 continuous years of full time service being with the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. (3)At least 55 years of age. Proposed law requires insurance benefits provided by proposed law to be based on the total amount of creditable service with a statewide retirement system including time earned in the Sheriff's Pension and Relief Fund and the recipient's coverage during the last active year of Page 3 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 140 SLS 22RS-155 ORIGINAL service with the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. Proposed law requires coverage of these insurance benefits to be extended to the recipient's eligible dependents if the recipient requests such coverage. Proposed law provides that recipients of insurance pursuant to proposed law be subject to all cost increases or changes to the active insurance plan. Proposed law applies to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs who retire on or after August 1, 2022. Effective July 1, 2022. (Amends R.S. 13:5554(G)(4)(c); adds R.S. 13:5554(G)(4)(d), (e), (f), and (g)) Page 4 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions.