SLS 22RS-155 ENGROSSED 2022 Regular Session SENATE BILL NO. 140 BY SENATOR ABRAHAM SHERIFFS. Provides for insurance benefits for retired sheriffs and deputies of the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. (7/1/22) 1 AN ACT 2 To amend and reenact R.S. 13:5554(G)(4)(c) and to enact R.S. 13:5554(G)(4)(d), (e), (f), 3 and (g), relative to insurance benefits for certain sheriffs and deputies; to provide for 4 eligibility requirements for the payment of insurance premium costs for retired 5 sheriffs and deputies of the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office; and to provide for related 6 matters. 7 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 8 Section 1. R.S. 13:554(G)(4)(c) is amended and reenacted and R.S. 9 13:5554(G)(4)(d), (e), (f), and (g) are hereby enacted to read as follows: 10 ยง5554. Group insurance; kinds; amounts; subrogation 11 * * * 12 G. * * * 13 (4) Notwithstanding the provisions of Paragraph (1) of this Subsection, the 14 sheriff of Acadia Parish shall pay out of the sheriff's general fund the premium costs 15 of group insurance for any sheriff or deputy sheriff who is eligible to receive benefits 16 from the Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund, as follows: 17 * * * Page 1 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 140 SLS 22RS-155 ENGROSSED 1 (c) The provisions of Paragraph (1) of this Subsection, as applicable to the 2 Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office, shall apply to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs retired on 3 or before December 31, 2014. The provisions of Subparagraphs (a) and (b) of this 4 Paragraph shall apply to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs who retire on or after January 1, 5 2015; however, any sheriff or deputy sheriff who has met the eligibility requirements 6 pursuant to Paragraph (1) of this Subsection, on or before June 30, 2014, may retire 7 at any time with benefits as provided in Paragraph (1) of this Subsection. 8 (d) Notwithstanding the provisions of Paragraph (1) of this Subsection 9 and Subparagraphs (a) through (c) of this Paragraph, one hundred percent of 10 the premium costs of group insurance, hospital, surgical, and medical expense 11 insurance and the first ten thousand dollars of life insurance contracted 12 pursuant to the provisions of this Section shall be paid in full from the sheriff's 13 general fund for any sheriff, full-time deputy sheriff, or any other employee who 14 has retired from the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office, who is eligible to receive 15 benefits from the Sheriff's Pension and Relief Fund, and who meets all of the 16 following qualifications: 17 (i) Has at least thirty years of creditable service with a statewide 18 retirement system with the final twelve years of continuous full-time creditable 19 service with the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. 20 (ii) Is at least fifty-five years of age. 21 (e) Insurance benefits provided for in Subparagraph (d) of this 22 Paragraph shall be based on the total amount of creditable service with a 23 statewide retirement system including time earned in the Sheriff's Pension and 24 Relief Fund and the recipient's coverage during the last active year of service 25 with the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. Coverage of these insurance benefits 26 shall be extended to the recipient's eligible dependents if the recipient requests 27 such coverage. 28 (f) Recipients of insurance pursuant to Subparagraph (d) of this 29 Paragraph are subject to all cost increases or changes to the active insurance Page 2 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 140 SLS 22RS-155 ENGROSSED 1 plan. 2 (g) The provisions of Subparagraph (d) of this Paragraph shall apply to 3 sheriffs and deputy sheriffs who retire on or after July 1, 2022. 4 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2022; if vetoed by the governor 5 and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on the day 6 following such approval by the legislature or July 1, 2022, whichever is later. The original instrument was prepared by Alan Miller. The following digest, which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by Michelle D. Ridge. DIGEST SB 140 Engrossed 2022 Regular Session Abraham Present law requires that any policy or self-insurance plan providing group hospital, surgical, medical expense, or life insurance contracted for under the provisions of present law contain a provision authorizing any covered employee retiring under his sheriff's department retirement plan to elect to continue such coverage upon retirement. Present law authorizes the premium cost of such coverage to be paid in full or in part from the sheriff's general funds or by the retired employee. Present law requires a uniform policy with respect to the payment of such premiums be formulated and applied by each sheriff. Present law requires the premium costs of group hospital, surgical, medical expense, and dental insurance and the first $10,000 of life insurance contracted for under the provisions of present law be paid in full from the Acadia parish sheriff's general fund for all Acadia parish sheriffs and deputy sheriffs retired with at least 15 years of service who are at least 55 years of age, or retired with at least 30 years of service at any age, on or after January 1, 2015. Proposed law requires the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office to pay out of the sheriff's general fund 100% of the premium costs of group insurance, hospital, surgical, and medical expense insurance and the first $10,000 of life insurance contracted pursuant to proposed law for any sheriff, full-time deputy sheriff, or any other employee who has retired from the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office and who is eligible to receive benefits from the Sheriff's Pension and Relief Fund, and that meets the following qualifications: (1)Has at least 30 years of service being in a statewide retirement system with the final 12 years of continuous full-time creditable service with the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. (2)Is at least 55 years of age. Proposed law requires insurance benefits provided by proposed law to be based on the total amount of creditable service with a statewide retirement system including time earned in the Sheriff's Pension and Relief Fund and the recipient's coverage during the last active year of service with the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Office. Proposed law requires coverage of these insurance benefits to be extended to the recipient's eligible dependents if the recipient requests such coverage. Proposed law provides that recipients of insurance pursuant to proposed law be subject to all cost increases or changes to the active insurance plan. Page 3 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 140 SLS 22RS-155 ENGROSSED Proposed law applies to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs who retire on or after August 1, 2022. Effective July 1, 2022. (Amends R.S. 13:5554(G)(4)(c); adds R.S. 13:5554(G)(4)(d), (e), (f), and (g)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Judiciary B to the original bill 1. Removes retirement deadline of July 1, 2022. 2. Increases the number of years a person must have in a statewide retirement system from 25 years to 30 years. 3. Makes technical changes. Page 4 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions.