Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB27 Engrossed / Bill

                    SLS 22RS-204	ENGROSSED
2022 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 27
BY SENATOR LAMBERT 
SUNSET LAW.  Re-creates the Department of Environmental Quality. (6/30/22)
1	AN ACT
2 To enact R.S. 49:191(13)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(10)(f), relative to the Department of
3 Environmental Quality, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the
4 Department of Environmental Quality and the statutory entities made a part of the
5 department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory
6 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related
7 matters.
8 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Environmental Quality and the
10 statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,
11 2022, and all statutory authority therefore is continued in accordance with the provisions of
12 Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
13 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of
14 Environmental Quality and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created
15 by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2027, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However,
16 the Department of Environmental Quality may be re-created prior to such date in accordance
17 with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 27
SLS 22RS-204	ENGROSSED
1 1950.
2 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
3 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
4 Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(13)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows:
5 §191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-
6	out period for statutory entities; table of dates
7	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
8 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
9 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
10 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
11 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
12	*          *          *
13	(13) July 1, 2026:
14	(a) The Department of Environmental Quality and all statutory entities
15 made a part of the department by law.
16 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(10)(f) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
17 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2022; if vetoed by the
18 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
19 June 30, 2022, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Tyler S. McCloud.
DIGEST
SB 27 Engrossed 2022 Regular Session	Lambert
Present law (Sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Environmental Quality and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law must begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities must cease as
of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the re-creation of the Dept. of Environmental Quality and its
statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, for a four-year period.
Effective June 30, 2022.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(13)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(f))
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.