Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB311 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 22RS-346	ORIGINAL
2022 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 311
BY SENATOR MILLIGAN 
HOMELAND SECURITY.  Requires the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and
Emergency Preparedness to adopt certain rules. (8/1/22)
1	AN ACT
2 To enact R.S. 29:726(E)(30) and (31), relative to the Governor's Office of Homeland
3 Security and Emergency Preparedness; to provide for authority and responsibilities;
4 to provide for promulgation of rules; to provide for an annual emergency
5 preparedness class; to provide for disbursement of assets and diversion of resources
6 during an emergency; and to provide for related matters.
7 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
8 Section 1.  R.S. 29:726(E)(30) and (31) are hereby enacted to read as follows:
9 ยง726. Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness;
10	authority and responsibilities
11	*          *          *
12	E. The office shall either directly or through authorized assignment to another
13 state agency or department:
14	*          *          *
15	(30) Prior to January 1, 2023, the office shall cause to be promulgated
16 standards and regulations in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act
17 for an annual emergency preparedness course for the benefit of local officials
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 311
SLS 22RS-346	ORIGINAL
1 and members of the legislature. Starting July 1, 2023, each local official and
2 member of the legislature shall be required to participate in this course.
3	(31) Prior to January 1, 2023, the office shall cause to be promulgated
4 standards and regulations in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act
5 regarding disbursement of assets and diversion of resources during a federally
6 or gubernatorial declared emergency.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Alan Miller.
DIGEST
SB 311 Original 2022 Regular Session	Milligan
Present law provides for authority and responsibilities of the Governor's Office of Homeland
Security and Emergency Preparedness (GOHSEP).
Proposed law requires GOHSEP to promulgate standards and regulations in accordance with
the APA for an annual emergency preparedness course for the benefit of local officials and
members of the legislature prior to 1/1/2023. 
Proposed law requires each local official and member of the legislature to participate in this
course beginning 7/1/2023. 
Proposed law requires GOHSEP to promulgate standards and regulations in accordance with
the APA regarding disbursement of assets and diversion of resources during a federally or
gubernatorial declared emergency prior to 1/1/2023. 
Effective August 1, 2022.
(Adds R.S. 29:726(E)(30) and (31))
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.