The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Curry Lann. DIGEST SB 55 Original 2022 Regular Session Cathey Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Agriculture and Forestry and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations as of July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2023, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Agriculture and Forestry and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Provides that July 1, 2027, is the new termination date and termination will begin on July 1, 2026, unless legislation is enacted to re-create the department prior to that date. Effective June 30, 2022. (Adds R.S. 49:191(13)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(c))