Louisiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB55 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 6 (SB 55) 2022 Regular Session	Cathey
Prior law (Sunset) provided that the Dept. of Agriculture and Forestry and all the statutory
entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations as of
July 1, 2022, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2023,
unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its
statutory entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Agriculture and Forestry and its
statutory entities, effective June 30, 2022, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes
the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and
which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along
with additional provisions. Provides that July 1, 2027, is the new termination date and
termination will begin on July 1, 2026, unless legislation is enacted to re-create the
department prior to that date.
Effective June 30, 2022.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(13)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(10)(c))