HLS 23RS-426 ENGROSSED 2023 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 250 BY REPRESENTATIVE BISHOP Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana. ASSESSORS: Authorizes assessors in each parish to increase their annual compensation 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:1907(A)(1) and to enact R.S. 47:1907(L) and (M), relative 3 to assessor compensation; to authorize assessors to increase their annual 4 compensation up to a certain amount over a certain period of time; to provide for 5 certain requirements and limitations; to require the publication of certain notice; to 6 provide for an effective date; and to provide for related matters. 7Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 8 Section 1. R.S. 47:1907(A)(1) is hereby amended and reenacted and R.S. 47:1907(L) 9and (M) are hereby enacted to read as follows: 10 ยง1907. Salaries 11 A.(1) Notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, except the 12 provisions of Subsections H, I, J, and K through M of this Section, in the 13 performance of all duties required of them by law, the assessors of the various 14 parishes shall receive an annual compensation, to be paid monthly on their own 15 warrant, based on the applicable population of the respective parishes, not to exceed 16 the compensation schedule provided for in this Paragraph according to the latest 17 decennial United States Census or the population estimates published pursuant to the Page 1 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 23RS-426 ENGROSSED HB NO. 250 1 United States Bureau of the Census Federal State Cooperative Program for 2 Population Estimates. 3 Population Compensation 4 (a) Greater than 250,000 $108,290 5 (b) 50,001 to 249,999 $98,290 6 (c) 50,000 or less $88,290 7 * * * 8 L. In addition to all other forms of compensation which are authorized for 9 assessors under the provisions of this Section, an assessor may increase his annual 10 compensation by an amount not to exceed two percent in calendar year 2023. 11 M.(1) In addition to all other forms of compensation which are authorized 12 for assessors under the provisions of this Section, an assessor may increase his 13 annual compensation once in an amount not to exceed eight percent during each 14 term. The increase in compensation authorized pursuant to the provisions of this 15 Subsection shall apply for each term beginning on or after January 1, 2025. 16 (2) The additional compensation authorized pursuant to the provisions of this 17 Subsection shall become effective thirty days after the one-time increase is disclosed 18 at a public meeting of the parish governing authority of the parish in which the 19 assessor's office is situated if the assessor publishes notice of his intent to increase 20 his compensation on two separate days in the official journal of the parish in which 21 the assessor's office is situated. The last day of publication of the notice shall be at 22 least thirty days prior to the public meeting of the parish governing authority wherein 23 the assessor discloses his intention to increase his compensation. 24 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2023; if vetoed by the governor 25and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1, 262023, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. Page 2 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 23RS-426 ENGROSSED HB NO. 250 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 250 Engrossed 2023 Regular Session Bishop Abstract: Authorizes an assessor to increase his annual compensation in calendar year 2023 by not more than 2% and further authorizes an assessor to increase his annual compensation by not more than 8% per term of office for terms beginning Jan. 1, 2025, if specific publication requirements are met. Present law requires assessors in each parish to receive annual compensation in the following amounts for the performance of all duties required of them in present law based on the following applicable population ranges: (1)If population is 50,000 or less, annual compensation of $88,290. (2)If population is 50,001 to 249,999, annual compensation of $98,290. (3)If population is greater than 250,000, annual compensation of $108,290. Present law authorizes the following compensation in addition to the annual compensation set forth in present law: (1)10% of annual compensation as a personal expense allowance. (2)One-time 7% increase after successful completion of a program to be a certified La. assessor and approval by a certification committee. (3)One-time $10,000 increase effective July 1, 1999. (4)One-time increase of not exceeding $7,000. (5)Beginning in calendar year 2013 and ending in calendar year 2016, an increase of up to 4% each calendar year over four calendar years. Proposed law retains present law and authorizes an assessor to increase his annual compensation by not more than 2% in calendar year 2023. Proposed law further authorizes, for terms beginning on or after Jan. 1, 2025, an assessor to increase his annual compensation once by not more than 8% during each term of office. This additional compensation shall become effective 30 days after the one-time increase is disclosed at a public meeting of the parish governing authority of the parish in which the assessor's office is situated if the assessor publishes notice of his intent to increase his compensation on two separate days in the parish's official journal. The last day of publication of the notice shall be at least 30 days prior to the public meeting of the parish governing authority wherein the assessor discloses his intention to increase his compensation. Effective July 1, 2023. (Amends R.S. 47:1907(A)(1); Adds R.S. 47:1907(L) and (M)) Page 3 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 23RS-426 ENGROSSED HB NO. 250 Summary of Amendments Adopted by House The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Ways and Means to the original bill: 1. Add authorization for an assessor to increase his annual compensation in calendar year 2023 by not more than 2%. 2. Decrease the additional compensation an assessor may increase his annual compensation per term from not more than 10% to not more than 8%. 3. Add requirement that the additional per-term increase in annual compensation shall become effective 30 days after the increase is disclosed at a public meeting of the parish governing authority of the parish in which the assessor's office is situated if the assessor publishes notice in the parish's official journal of his intent to increase his compensation on two separate days. Further requires the last day of publication of the notice to be at least 30 days prior to the public meeting wherein the assessor discloses his intention to increase his compensation. 4. Add applicability of the per-term increase in annual compensation provided for in proposed law to terms beginning on or after Jan. 1, 2025. Page 4 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.