HLS 23RS-1347 ORIGINAL 2023 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 634 BY REPRESENTATIVE MCFARLAND TAX/SEVERANCE TAX: Provides relative to a severance tax exemption for deep-well oil and gas production 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:633(9)(d)(v), relative to severance tax; to provide with 3 respect to a severance tax exemption for production of oil and gas from wells drilled 4 to a certain depth; to provide for eligibility for the exemption; to provide with respect 5 to certain applications for well status determination filed with the Department of 6 Natural Resources; to provide for the application of certain laws; to provide an 7 effective date; and to provide for related matters. 8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 9 Section 1. R.S. 47:633(9)(d)(v) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 10 ยง633. Rates of tax 11 The taxes on natural resources severed from the soil or water levied by R.S. 12 47:631 shall be predicated on the quantity or value of the products or resources 13 severed and shall be paid at the following rates: 14 * * * 15 (9) 16 * * * 17 (d) 18 * * * 19 (v) Production of natural gas, gas condensate, and oil from any well drilled 20 to a true vertical depth of more than fifteen thousand feet, where production Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 23RS-1347 ORIGINAL HB NO. 634 1 commences after July 31, 1994, shall be exempt from severance tax, from the date 2 production begins, for twenty-four months or until payout of the well cost, whichever 3 comes first. For the purpose of this exemption, the date production begins may be 4 a date subsequent to the well completion date. 5 * * * 6 Section 2. The provisions of this Act shall apply to each Application for Well Status 7Determination (Deep Well) filed with the office of conservation of the Department of 8Natural Resources on or after January 1, 2023. Each applicant who filed such an application 9on or after January 1, 2023, and prior to the effective date of this Act shall be permitted to 10amend its application to conform with the provisions of this Act. 11 Section 3. The provisions of this Act are procedural and interpretive. 12 Section 4. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2023; if vetoed by the governor 13and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1, 142023, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 634 Original 2023 Regular Session McFarland Abstract: Provides for eligibility for a severance tax exemption for production of natural gas, gas condensate, and oil from any well drilled to a depth of more than 15,000 feet. Present law, pursuant to the authority of present constitution, levies severance taxes on all natural resources severed from the soil or water, including all forms of timber, including pulp woods, turpentine, and other forest products; minerals such as oil, gas, natural gasoline, distillate, condensate, casinghead gasoline, sulphur, salt, coal, lignite, and ores; marble, stone, sand, shells, and other natural deposits; and the salt content in brine. Present law provides that production of natural gas, gas condensate, and oil from any well drilled to a true vertical depth of more than 15,000 feet shall be exempt from severance tax, from the date production begins, for 24 months or until payout of the well cost, whichever comes first. Proposed law retains present law and provides that for purposes of eligibility for the exemption, the date production begins may be a date subsequent to the well completion date. Proposed law stipulates that its provisions shall apply to each Application for Well Status Determination (Deep Well) filed with the office of conservation of the Dept. of Natural Resources on or after Jan. 1, 2023. Provides that each applicant who filed such an Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 23RS-1347 ORIGINAL HB NO. 634 application on or after Jan. 1, 2023, and prior to the effective date of proposed law shall be permitted to amend its application to conform with the provisions of proposed law. Proposed law establishes that its provisions are procedural and interpretive. Effective July 1, 2023. (Amends R.S. 47:633(9)(d)(v)) Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.