HLS 23RS-848 ORIGINAL 2023 Regular Session HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 124 BY REPRESENTATIVE JORDAN WEAPONS/FIREARMS: Creates a task force to study the benefits of mandatory liability insurance coverage for owners of firearms 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2To create a task force to study and make recommendations with respect to the benefits of 3 mandatory liability insurance coverage for owners of firearms in Louisiana. 4 WHEREAS, insurance is an industry affected with public interest, and after 5well-informed, reasoned analysis, it is the duty of the Louisiana Legislature to enact 6legislation concerning the industry and coverage with respect to risks affecting citizens of 7this state; and 8 WHEREAS, the Violence Policy Center, a non-profit educational organization based 9in Washington D.C., uses data from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for its 10studies which have been published every year since 2006; and 11 WHEREAS, the United States is facing an unprecedented crisis of violence with 12firearms, and according to the study published by the Violence Policy Center in 2023, 13Louisiana has the second highest death rate associated with firearms in the nation; and 14 WHEREAS, the study attributes Louisiana's firearm death rate to the prevalence of 15ownership among Louisianians and firearm safety laws that do not exceed federal law; and 16 WHEREAS, Louisiana has a compelling interest in reducing the number of firearm 17deaths resulting from homicides, suicides, and unintentional deaths; and 18 WHEREAS, firearm liability insurance covers damages for accidents and 19unintentional harm through use of a firearm including but not limited to death, injury, or 20property damage, but not acts of lawful self-defense; and Page 1 of 3 HLS 23RS-848 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 124 1 WHEREAS, concealed carry insurance may cover a wider range of risks, including 2acts of lawful self-defense and costs of associated legal defense; and 3 WHEREAS, neither firearm liability nor concealed carry insurance protects owners 4of firearms who engage in criminal acts; and 5 WHEREAS, firearm liability and concealed carry insurance may be offered through 6a homeowner's or renter's insurance policy that provides liability coverage, or through a 7separate liability or concealed carry insurance policy for firearms; and 8 WHEREAS, mandatory firearm liability or concealed carry insurance may 9incentivize owners of firearms to promote personal safety and increase precautionary 10behaviors to prevent children and other unauthorized individuals from accessing the owner's 11firearm, thus aiding reduction of the overall number of deaths resulting from firearms in this 12state. 13 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby 14create a task force to study and make recommendations with respect to the benefits of 15mandatory liability insurance coverage for owners of firearms in Louisiana. 16 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that in the study, the task force shall identify the 17sources available for Louisiana firearm owners to acquire mandatory liability insurance; the 18cost of premiums; means of how such insurance may alleviate taxpayers' spending in public 19response to harm caused by firearms; and ways in which such insurance may promote safer 20behaviors of firearm owners in this state. 21 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that in the study, the task force shall review the Gun 22Harm Reduction Ordinance, Ordinance No. 30716, adopted on February 8, 2022, by the San 23José City Council of the City of San José, California. 24 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall be composed of the 25following members: 26 (1) The commissioner of insurance or his designee. 27 (2) One representative from the Louisiana Property and Casualty Insurance 28Commission. 29 (3) One representative from the Independent Insurance Agents and Brokers of 30Louisiana. Page 2 of 3 HLS 23RS-848 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 124 1 (4) One representative from the Professional Insurance Agents of Louisiana. 2 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force may consult with any other 3agencies or associations deemed appropriate by the task force regarding this study. 4 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the commissioner of insurance shall serve as the 5chairman of the task force and the staff of the Department of Insurance shall provide support 6to the task force. 7 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a majority of the total membership shall 8constitute a quorum of the task force, and any official action by the task force shall require 9an affirmative vote of a majority of the quorum present and voting. 10 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the names of the members designated or selected 11as provided herein shall be submitted to the chairman of the task force by July 15, 2023, and 12the chairman shall thereafter call the first meeting of the task force by August 15, 2023. 13 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall meet as necessary and make 14a written report of its findings to the House Committee on Insurance and the Senate 15Committee on Insurance by February 1, 2024, together with any specific proposals for 16legislation. 17 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall terminate upon the date of 18submission of its report. 19 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 20commissioner of insurance, the Louisiana Property and Casualty Insurance Commission, 21the chief executive officer of the Independent Insurance Agents and Brokers of Louisiana, 22and the executive vice president of the Professional Insurance Agents of Louisiana. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HCR 124 Original 2023 Regular Session Jordan Creates a task force to study and make recommendations with respect to the benefits of mandatory liability insurance coverage for owners of firearms in the state of La. Requires the task force to provide a written report of its findings and recommendations to the legislative committees on insurance by Feb. 1, 2024. Page 3 of 3