Louisiana 2023 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR40 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 23RS-897	ORIGINAL
2023 Regular Session
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 40
BY REPRESENTATIVE PIERRE
STATE AGENCIES:  Urges and requests state agencies report certain fiscal data on
transportation services provided to their clients
1	A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
2To urge and request each state agency report fiscal data regarding the amount, source, and
3 spending categories of any program funds spent on transportation services for their
4 clients.
5 WHEREAS, inadequate transportation forces state agency programs to pay for
6transportation services for the individuals they serve to be able to participate in their
7programs; and
8 WHEREAS, these programs would fail to fulfill their stated purposes without these
9transportation services; and
10 WHEREAS, persons who are disabled or elderly rely on public transportation to live
11and work in their communities, and a lack of reliable transportation severely limits their
12ability to live independently; and
13 WHEREAS, current transportation funding sources are duplicative and lack
14coordination to avoid waste and ensure optimal use; and
15 WHEREAS, many of these sources can be used to match federal dollars and expand
16transportation services statewide; and
17 WHEREAS, obtaining fiscal data on state agency spending for transportation
18services will help better coordinate transportation services across the state and reduce the
19need to take funds from non transportation state agency programs.
Page 1 of 2 HLS 23RS-897	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 40
1 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
2urge and request that the fiscal officers of each state agency report to the commissioner of
3administration, by October 1, 2023, the amount, source, and spending category for any
4transportation services during Fiscal Year 2022, including direct payments to clients, as well
5as funds paid to vendors or contractors.
6 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the commissioner of administration shall then
7compile a summary report that identifies the total amount spent on transportation services
8by state agency programs and provide the report to the Department of Transportation and
9Development, public transportation section, by December 1, 2023.
10 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Department of Transportation and
11Development, public transportation section, shall examine the data and report to the House
12Transportation, Highways, and Public Works Committee by February 1, 2024, with a
13recommendation on how the state can better coordinate and maximize transportation services
14for the citizens of the state of Louisiana.
15 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
16commissioner of administration.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HCR 40 Original 2023 Regular Session	Pierre
Urges and requests state agencies to report fiscal data for program funds spent on
transportation services for their clients and that the data be compiled by the commissioner
of administration for use in better coordinating transportation services.  Requires the
commissioner of administration provide a summary report of the collected data to the Dept.
of Transportation and Development, public transportation section, by Dec. 1, 2023. 
Requires the department report their recommendations to the House Committee on
Transportation, Highways, and Public Works by Feb. 1, 2024.
Page 2 of 2