HLS 23RS-897 ORIGINAL 2023 Regular Session HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 40 BY REPRESENTATIVE PIERRE STATE AGENCIES: Urges and requests state agencies report certain fiscal data on transportation services provided to their clients 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2To urge and request each state agency report fiscal data regarding the amount, source, and 3 spending categories of any program funds spent on transportation services for their 4 clients. 5 WHEREAS, inadequate transportation forces state agency programs to pay for 6transportation services for the individuals they serve to be able to participate in their 7programs; and 8 WHEREAS, these programs would fail to fulfill their stated purposes without these 9transportation services; and 10 WHEREAS, persons who are disabled or elderly rely on public transportation to live 11and work in their communities, and a lack of reliable transportation severely limits their 12ability to live independently; and 13 WHEREAS, current transportation funding sources are duplicative and lack 14coordination to avoid waste and ensure optimal use; and 15 WHEREAS, many of these sources can be used to match federal dollars and expand 16transportation services statewide; and 17 WHEREAS, obtaining fiscal data on state agency spending for transportation 18services will help better coordinate transportation services across the state and reduce the 19need to take funds from non transportation state agency programs. Page 1 of 2 HLS 23RS-897 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 40 1 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby 2urge and request that the fiscal officers of each state agency report to the commissioner of 3administration, by October 1, 2023, the amount, source, and spending category for any 4transportation services during Fiscal Year 2022, including direct payments to clients, as well 5as funds paid to vendors or contractors. 6 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the commissioner of administration shall then 7compile a summary report that identifies the total amount spent on transportation services 8by state agency programs and provide the report to the Department of Transportation and 9Development, public transportation section, by December 1, 2023. 10 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Department of Transportation and 11Development, public transportation section, shall examine the data and report to the House 12Transportation, Highways, and Public Works Committee by February 1, 2024, with a 13recommendation on how the state can better coordinate and maximize transportation services 14for the citizens of the state of Louisiana. 15 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 16commissioner of administration. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HCR 40 Original 2023 Regular Session Pierre Urges and requests state agencies to report fiscal data for program funds spent on transportation services for their clients and that the data be compiled by the commissioner of administration for use in better coordinating transportation services. Requires the commissioner of administration provide a summary report of the collected data to the Dept. of Transportation and Development, public transportation section, by Dec. 1, 2023. Requires the department report their recommendations to the House Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works by Feb. 1, 2024. Page 2 of 2