HLS 23RS-897 ENGROSSED 2023 Regular Session HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 40 BY REPRESENTATIVE PIERRE STATE AGENCIES: Urges and requests state agencies report certain fiscal data on transportation services provided to their clients 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2To urge and request each state agency report fiscal data regarding the amount, source, and 3 spending categories of any program funds spent on transportation services for their 4 clients. 5 WHEREAS, inadequate transportation forces state agency programs to pay for 6transportation services for the individuals they serve to be able to participate in their 7programs; and 8 WHEREAS, these programs would fail to fulfill their stated purposes without these 9transportation services; and 10 WHEREAS, persons who are disabled or elderly rely on public transportation to live 11and work in their communities, and a lack of reliable transportation severely limits their 12ability to live independently; and 13 WHEREAS, current transportation funding sources are duplicative and lack 14coordination to avoid waste and ensure optimal use; and 15 WHEREAS, many of these sources can be used to match federal dollars and expand 16transportation services statewide; and 17 WHEREAS, obtaining fiscal data on state agency spending for transportation 18services will help better coordinate transportation services across the state and reduce the 19need to take funds from non transportation state agency programs. Page 1 of 3 HLS 23RS-897 ENGROSSED HCR NO. 40 1 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby 2urge and request that the agency head or designee of each state agency report to the 3Department of Transportation and Development, public transportation section, by August 41, 2023, the amount, source, and spending category for any transportation services during 5Fiscal Year 2022, including direct payments to clients, as well as funds paid to vendors or 6contractors, or that there are no funds or expenditures to report. 7 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Department of Transportation and 8Development, public transportation section, shall then compile a summary report that 9identifies the total amount spent on transportation services by state agency programs. 10 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Department of Transportation and 11Development, public transportation section, shall examine the data and report to the House 12Transportation, Highways, and Public Works Committee by February 1, 2024, with a 13recommendation on how the state can better coordinate and maximize transportation services 14for the citizens of the state of Louisiana. 15 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 16agency head of each state agency. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HCR 40 Engrossed 2023 Regular Session Pierre Urges and requests state agencies to report fiscal data for program funds spent on transportation services for their clients and that the data be compiled by the commissioner of administration for use in better coordinating transportation services. Urges agency heads to provide a summary report of the collected data to the Dept. of Transportation and Development, public transportation section, by Dec. 1, 2023. Requires the department report their recommendations to the House transportation committees by Feb. 1, 2024. Summary of Amendments Adopted by House The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works to the original bill: 1. Change the entity responsible for reporting transportation cost related data from fiscal officers to agency head or designee. 2. Change the entity responsible for compiling the transportation cost related data from the commissioner of administration to the Dept. of Transportation and Development, public transportation section. Page 2 of 3 HLS 23RS-897 ENGROSSED HCR NO. 40 3. Change the date that transportation cost related data is to be submitted from Oct. 1, 2023 to Aug. 1, 2023. 4. Remove from public transportation section the requirement to provide the report to the Dept. of Transportation by Dec. 1, 2023. 5. Change the authority for a copy of the resolution to be transmitted from the commissioner of administration to the agency head of each state agency. Page 3 of 3