HLS 23RS-2963 ENGROSSED 2023 Regular Session HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 173 BY REPRESENTATIVES BUTLER AND ECHOLS MEDICAID: Directs the La. Dept. of Health to report statistics on abuse and neglect in certain Medicaid programs 1 A RESOLUTION 2To direct the Louisiana Department of Health to report information, including statistics, on 3 abuse and neglect in certain Medicaid programs. 4 WHEREAS, the Louisiana Department of Health (LDH) defines abuse as the 5infliction of physical or mental injury, or actions which may reasonably be expected to 6inflict physical injury, on an adult by other parties as defined in R.S. 15:1503; and 7 WHEREAS, LDH also defines neglect as the failure, by a caregiver responsible for 8an adult's care or by other parties, to provide the proper or necessary support or medical, 9surgical, or any other care necessary for his well-being as defined in R.S. 15:1503; and 10 WHEREAS, according to LDH, the integrity of the Medicaid program in this state 11is protected by its abuse policies; and 12 WHEREAS, the LDH website provides detailed descriptions of activities that may 13be considered abusive in accordance with Louisiana law and otherwise; and 14 WHEREAS, there is a multitude of Medicaid-related health programs in this state; 15and 16 WHEREAS, Medicaid is the primary health insurance provider for many individuals 17with disabilities; and 18 WHEREAS, such individuals rely heavily on the Medicaid program in this state and 19the caregivers and additional support provided by such programs; and 20 WHEREAS, such individuals may require a significant amount of medical attention 21and daily living assistance as they are unable to care for themselves; and Page 1 of 3 HLS 23RS-2963 ENGROSSED HR NO. 173 1 WHEREAS, ensuring the safety of such individuals in this state is of the utmost 2importance to the Legislature of Louisiana and the citizens of this state; and 3 WHEREAS, the statistics of such programs are indicative of the effectiveness and 4efficiency of the Medicaid program in this state; and 5 WHEREAS, it is the duty of the Legislature of Louisiana to ensure the integrity of 6Medicaid program in this state and the practices of the program to ensure the safety of 7recipients of such services. 8 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the 9Legislature of Louisiana does hereby direct the Louisiana Department of Health to produce 10a report enumerating and summarizing all allegations of abuse and neglect in Medicaid 11providers of Home and Community-Based Services (HCBS) as defined in R.S. 40:2120.2, 12Intermediate Care Facilities for the Developmentally Disabled (ICF-DD), and Adult Day 13Health Care (ADHC) services. 14 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the statistics shall include information from the 15Health Standards Section of the Louisiana Department of Health, adult protection services 16of the office of aging and adult services, the Louisiana Department of Children and Family 17Services, and the governor's office of elderly affairs regarding services provided by the 18office of aging and adult services, the office for citizens with developmental disabilities, 19nursing homes, intermediate care facilities for developmental disabilities, waiver programs, 20and any other facilities that provide home- and community-based living services in this state 21for which the Louisiana Department of Health has oversight. 22 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the information included in the report shall 23contain statistics from January 1, 2021, to December 31, 2022. 24 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the information required by this Resolution shall 25include all of the following information: 26 (1) The existing rules promulgated to address the reporting of claims of abuse and 27neglect for the state's Medicaid program of residents and clients of Medicaid providers of 28HCBS, ICF-DD, and ADHC. Page 2 of 3 HLS 23RS-2963 ENGROSSED HR NO. 173 1 (2) An enumerated list summarizing the reported abuse and neglect claims of 2residents, clients of residents, and clients of Medicaid providers of HCBS, ICF-DD, and 3ADHC. 4 (3) An enumerated list of the additional rules promulgated in effect from January 1, 52021 to December 31, 2022 and applicable to allegations of abuse and neglect involving 6residents and clients of Medicaid providers of HCBS, ICF-DD, and ADHC services. 7 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that on or before July 1, 2024, the Louisiana 8Department of Health shall submit to the House Committee on Health and Welfare and the 9David R. Poynter Legislative Research Library a written report of its findings. 10 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 11secretary of the Louisiana Department of Health. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HR 173 Engrossed 2023 Regular Session Butler Directs the La. Dept. of Health to report information, including statistics, on abuse and neglect in certain Medicaid programs. Summary of Amendments Adopted by House The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Health and Welfare to the original bill: 1. Require the report produced to enumerate and summarize all allegations of abuse and neglect in the provision of certain Medicaid services as provided in present law. 2. Specify which content shall be included in the statistics report. 3. Insert language that includes residents and clients of Medicaid providers in the requirements for the report. 4. Change the date of submission for the report from February 1, 2024 to July 1, 2024. 5. Make technical corrections. Page 3 of 3