Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR114

Introduced
5/4/23  
Passed
5/8/23  
Expresses condolences on the death of Lula Ruth Vinson
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR115

Introduced
5/4/23  
Commends William S. Wainwright, Ph.D., for his service to Northshore Technical Community College and the Louisiana Community and Technical College System
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR116

Introduced
5/4/23  
Introduced
5/4/23  
Passed
5/8/23  
Recognizes May 10, 2023, as Arc Appreciation Day at the state capitol and commends the twenty-two affiliated local chapters of The Arc of Louisiana for their dedication to individuals with disabilities and their families over the last sixty-nine years
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR117

Introduced
5/4/23  
Introduced
5/4/23  
Passed
5/8/23  
Commends North Central High School for the academic and athletic achievements of its students
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR118

Introduced
5/4/23  
Introduced
5/4/23  
Passed
5/8/23  
Designates Monday, May 8, 2023, as Louisiana Renewable Energy Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR119

Introduced
5/8/23  
Introduced
5/8/23  
Passed
5/9/23  
Recognizes May 8-12, 2023, as Louisiana Charter Schools Week at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR12

Introduced
4/11/23  
Introduced
4/11/23  
Passed
4/12/23  
Commends the Tulane University Green Wave football team on winning the 2023 Cotton Bowl Classic
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR120

Introduced
5/8/23  
Introduced
5/8/23  
Passed
5/9/23  
Commends the coaches and players on the Cardinals American Legion baseball team from Kenner, Louisiana, on their achievements
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR121

Introduced
5/8/23  
Introduced
5/8/23  
Passed
5/9/23  
Designates May 9, 2023, as Acadiana Red and White Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR122

Introduced
5/8/23  
Commends the Kaplan High School softball team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2023 Non-Select Division III state championship
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR123

Introduced
5/8/23  
Introduced
5/8/23  
Passed
5/9/23  
Recognizes May 8-12, 2023, as Teacher Appreciation Week and Teacher Appreciation Fest in Louisiana House District No. 87
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR124

Introduced
5/8/23  
Introduced
5/8/23  
Passed
5/9/23  
Recognizes May 18, 2023, as Community Provider Association Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR125

Introduced
5/8/23  
Introduced
5/8/23  
Passed
5/9/23  
Commends the 2023 participants of the Youth Legislature program
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR126

Introduced
5/8/23  
Introduced
5/8/23  
Passed
5/9/23  
Recognizes May 16, 2023, as Plaquemines Parish Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR127

Introduced
5/8/23  
Commends Fletter Cox Taylor for her service to Red River Parish

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records