Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR5

Introduced
4/10/23  
Introduced
4/10/23  
Passed
4/11/23  
Recognizes April 11, 2023, as Ponchatoula Strawberry Festival Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR50

Introduced
4/19/23  
Passed
4/20/23  
Recognizes June 27, 2023, as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR51

Introduced
4/19/23  
Introduced
4/19/23  
Passed
4/20/23  
Commends the Louisiana Home Care Association and recognizes May 2, 2023, as Home Care Day
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR52

Introduced
4/19/23  
Introduced
4/19/23  
Passed
4/20/23  
Commends Wilbert Jones for dedicating fifty years as a member of the J. B. Cade Chapter of the Association of the United States Army
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR53

Introduced
4/20/23  
Passed
4/24/23  
Recognizes April 20, 2023, as Junior League Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR54

Introduced
4/20/23  
Introduced
4/20/23  
Commends Reverend Ronald Perkins on the occasion of his twentieth anniversary as pastor of Greater Zion Mission Baptist Church
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR55

Introduced
4/20/23  
Passed
4/24/23  
Commends the Hathaway High School Lady Hornets basketball team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2023 Division V state championship
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR56

Introduced
4/20/23  
Passed
4/24/23  
Commends Kaydence Bradford on her selection as a 2023 Louisiana Public Broadcasting Young Hero
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR57

Introduced
4/20/23  
Commends Canaan Hoosier on his selection as a 2023 Louisiana Public Broadcasting Young Hero
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR58

Introduced
4/20/23  
Passed
4/24/23  
Commends Lindsay McKinney on her selection as a 2023 Louisiana Public Broadcasting Young Hero
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR59

Introduced
4/20/23  
Introduced
4/20/23  
Commends Nicholas Tarver on his selection as a 2023 Louisiana Public Broadcasting Young Hero
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR6

Introduced
4/10/23  
Introduced
4/10/23  
Designates Thursday, April 13, 2023, as 4-H Day at the state capitol and commends the state 4-H officers
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR60

Introduced
4/20/23  
Commends Kelsie Tillage on her selection as a 2023 Louisiana Public Broadcasting Young Hero
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR61

Introduced
4/20/23  
Passed
4/24/23  
Commends Vivienne Webb on her selection as a 2023 Louisiana Public Broadcasting Young Hero
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR62

Introduced
4/20/23  
Passed
4/24/23  
Commends the Northwood High School Gators basketball team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2023 Division IV state championship

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records