Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate 2023 Bills & Legislation

LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR48

Introduced
4/27/23  
Introduced
4/27/23  
Passed
5/1/23  
Recognizes May 6, 2023, as Louisiana Firefighter's Appreciation Day and commends the firefighters of Louisiana for their dedication.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR49

Introduced
5/1/23  
Introduced
5/1/23  
Passed
5/10/23  
Expresses condolences on the death of Conrell Collins Sr.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR5

Introduced
4/10/23  
Introduced
4/10/23  
Refer
4/11/23  
Refer
4/11/23  
Report Pass
4/25/23  
Passed
4/26/23  
Creates the Protective Order Procedure and Records Task Force.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR50

Introduced
5/1/23  
Introduced
5/1/23  
Designates and recognizes Tuesday, May 2, 2023, as Main Street Day at the state capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR51

Introduced
5/1/23  
Introduced
5/1/23  
Passed
5/2/23  
Commends Odyssey House Louisiana for its mission, growth, and impact over fifty years of service in treating individuals with chronic addictions.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR52

Introduced
5/1/23  
Introduced
5/1/23  
Commends the Ready Louisiana Coalition and designates Monday, May 1, 2023, as Early Education Day at the state capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR53

Introduced
5/1/23  
Introduced
5/1/23  
Refer
5/2/23  
Refer
5/2/23  
Report Pass
5/10/23  
Report Pass
5/10/23  
Passed
5/11/23  
Memorializes Congress to enact a trade policy that supports United States businesses and workers while penalizing global polluters.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR54

Introduced
5/1/23  
Introduced
5/1/23  
Passed
5/2/23  
Expresses condolences on the death of Reverend Thomas Anthony James, S.V.D.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR55

Introduced
5/1/23  
Introduced
5/1/23  
Passed
5/2/23  
Recognizes and commends the Louisiana Court Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) programs and volunteers.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR56

Introduced
5/2/23  
Introduced
5/2/23  
Passed
5/3/23  
Commends Jennifer Steel Bourgeois for being a guardian angel to the Westbank of New Orleans.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR57

Introduced
5/2/23  
Introduced
5/2/23  
Passed
5/3/23  
Recognizes May 3, 2023, as Literacy Day at the state capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR58

Introduced
5/2/23  
Introduced
5/2/23  
Passed
5/3/23  
Designates May 4, 2023, as Rural Mental Health Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR59

Introduced
5/3/23  
Introduced
5/3/23  
Passed
5/4/23  
Commends Elizabeth Ann Howard Lewis on the occasion of her ninetieth birthday.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR6

Introduced
4/11/23  
Commends Jerry Arledge on the occasion of his retirement as West Monroe High School head football coach.
LA

Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR60

Introduced
5/3/23  
Expresses condolences and honors the life of Rhyann Green.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records