Louisiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB15 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 536 (HB 15) 2024 Regular Session	Fontenot
Existing law provides that various classes of employees are members of the Municipal Police
Employees' Retirement System (MPERS).
New law amends the definition of employee to:
(1)Remove requirements that certain employees be in positions defined by the municipal
fire and police civil service system and paid from the police department's budget.
(2)Amend with respect to employees of the Baton Rouge Police Department.
(3)Provide with respect to certain police officers enrolled in another retirement system.
New law provides that a member of MPERS who is elected to a position and becomes
eligible to join another retirement system may terminate his membership in MPERS upon
enrollment in the other retirement system.  Requires the member to file a notice with the
board of trustees and that employee and employer contributions to the system cease upon
receipt of notice.  Provides that the former member may apply for retirement from MPERS
after termination in the system.
Existing law provides for eligibility for retirement for members of MPERS.
New law provides that a member may retire if he meets the following:
(1)He has attained age 62.
(2)He has seven years or more of service credit.
(3)He is not eligible to retire under existing law but is an elected a chief of police
subject to term limits.
New law requires the member to irrevocably elect to receive no additional service credit or
accrue any additional retirement benefit.  Provides that the employee and employer pay
contributions to the system during any reemployment period of such a retiree.  Provides for
the refunding of employee contributions without interest.
Existing law requires suspension of the retirement benefit of an MPERS retiree who returns
to employment in a position covered by MPERS and provides that such a reemployed retiree
earns additional service credit during reemployment.  Exempts certain retirees who are
reemployed in part-time positions.
New law provides that the following are exempt from the required benefit suspension:
(1)A member who retires between July 1, 2024, and June 30, 2026, who is employed no
sooner than 90 days after his retirement and who irrevocably elects to earn no
additional service credit or accrue any additional retirement benefit.
(2)A member who retired on or before Jan. 1, 2024, with 25 years of service credit or,
if he has attained the age of 55, with 20 or more years of service credit and who
becomes an employee before July 1, 2028.
New law, for retirees who are exempt from the benefit suspension, provides that the
employee and employer pay contributions to the system during the reemployment period. 
Provides  for the refunding of employee contributions without interest.
Effective upon signature of governor (June 10, 2024).
(Amends R.S. 11:2213(11)(a)(iii) and 2220(A)(2)(a); Adds R.S. 11:2213(11)(i) and (j),
2214.1, 2220(A)(4), and 2241.4(A)(4))