RÉSUMÉ DIGEST ACT 536 (HB 15) 2024 Regular Session Fontenot Existing law provides that various classes of employees are members of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (MPERS). New law amends the definition of employee to: (1)Remove requirements that certain employees be in positions defined by the municipal fire and police civil service system and paid from the police department's budget. (2)Amend with respect to employees of the Baton Rouge Police Department. (3)Provide with respect to certain police officers enrolled in another retirement system. New law provides that a member of MPERS who is elected to a position and becomes eligible to join another retirement system may terminate his membership in MPERS upon enrollment in the other retirement system. Requires the member to file a notice with the board of trustees and that employee and employer contributions to the system cease upon receipt of notice. Provides that the former member may apply for retirement from MPERS after termination in the system. Existing law provides for eligibility for retirement for members of MPERS. New law provides that a member may retire if he meets the following: (1)He has attained age 62. (2)He has seven years or more of service credit. (3)He is not eligible to retire under existing law but is an elected a chief of police subject to term limits. New law requires the member to irrevocably elect to receive no additional service credit or accrue any additional retirement benefit. Provides that the employee and employer pay contributions to the system during any reemployment period of such a retiree. Provides for the refunding of employee contributions without interest. Existing law requires suspension of the retirement benefit of an MPERS retiree who returns to employment in a position covered by MPERS and provides that such a reemployed retiree earns additional service credit during reemployment. Exempts certain retirees who are reemployed in part-time positions. New law provides that the following are exempt from the required benefit suspension: (1)A member who retires between July 1, 2024, and June 30, 2026, who is employed no sooner than 90 days after his retirement and who irrevocably elects to earn no additional service credit or accrue any additional retirement benefit. (2)A member who retired on or before Jan. 1, 2024, with 25 years of service credit or, if he has attained the age of 55, with 20 or more years of service credit and who becomes an employee before July 1, 2028. New law, for retirees who are exempt from the benefit suspension, provides that the employee and employer pay contributions to the system during the reemployment period. Provides for the refunding of employee contributions without interest. Effective upon signature of governor (June 10, 2024). (Amends R.S. 11:2213(11)(a)(iii) and 2220(A)(2)(a); Adds R.S. 11:2213(11)(i) and (j), 2214.1, 2220(A)(4), and 2241.4(A)(4))