Louisiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB192 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 24RS-626	ENGROSSED
2024 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 192
BY REPRESENTATIVE MILLER
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Louisiana Department of Health
1	AN ACT
2To enact R.S. 49:191(2)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(12)(h), relative to the Louisiana
3 Department of Health, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the
4 Louisiana Department of Health and the statutory entities made a part of the
5 department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory
6 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; to provide for an effective date;
7 and to provide for related matters.
8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Louisiana Department of Health and the
10statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,
112024, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of
12Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
13 Section 2.  All statutory authority for the existence of the Louisiana Department of
14Health and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 1 of
15this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2029, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Louisiana
16Department of Health may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions
17of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
18 Section 3.  The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
19those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 24RS-626	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 192
1 Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(2)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 
2 ยง191.  Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-
3	out period for statutory entities; table of dates
4	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
5 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
6 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
7 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
8 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
9	*          *          *
10	(2)  July 1, 2028:
11	*          *          *
12	(b)  The Louisiana Department of Health and all statutory entities made a part
13 of the department by law. 
14 Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(12)(h) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
15 Section 6.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2024; if vetoed by the
16governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
17June 30, 2024, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 192 Engrossed 2024 Regular Session	Miller
Abstract: Re-creates the La. Dept. of Health.
Present law (Sunset) provides that the La. Dept. of Health and all the statutory entities made
a part of that department by law begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2024, and that
all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2025, unless the legislature
enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior
thereto. 
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the La. Dept. of Health and its statutory
entities, effective June 30, 2024, in accordance with the "sunset" law. 
Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for
review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create such statutory entity
within the department along with additional provisions.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 24RS-626	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 192
Proposed law makes July 1, 2029, the new termination date and termination would begin
July 1, 2028, unless the department is re-created again. 
Effective June 30, 2024.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(2)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(h)) 
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.