DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 192 Engrossed 2024 Regular Session Miller Abstract: Re-creates the La. Dept. of Health. Present law (Sunset) provides that the La. Dept. of Health and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2024, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2025, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the La. Dept. of Health and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2024, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create such statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2029, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2028, unless the department is re-created again. Effective June 30, 2024. (Adds R.S. 49:191(2)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(h))