RÉSUMÉ DIGEST ACT 20 (HB 192) 2024 Regular Session Miller Prior law (Sunset) provides that the La. Dept. of Health and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2024, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2025, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. New law provides for the general re-creation of the La. Dept. of Health and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2024, in accordance with the "sunset" law. New law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create such statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. New law makes July 1, 2029, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2028, unless the department is re-created again. Effective June 30, 2024. (Adds R.S. 49:191(2)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(h))