Louisiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB400 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 24RS-602	ORIGINAL
2024 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 400
BY REPRESENTATIVE RISER
HUNTING/LICENSES:  Provides relative to lifetime combination hunting and fishing
licenses
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 56:649.7 and 3005, relative to lifetime combination hunting and
3 fishing licenses; to establish resident and nonresident infant lifetime licenses; to
4 establish fees for infant lifetime licenses; to increase the fees for resident lifetime
5 licenses; to provide for adjustments of lifetime license fees for inflation; to provide
6 an effective date; and to provide for related matters.
7Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
8 Section 1.  R.S. 56:649.7 and 3005 are hereby amended and reenacted to read as
9follows:
10 §649.7.  Infant combination lifetime hunting and fishing license
11	Beginning January 1, 2025, the department shall make available for persons
12 under the age of three a combination lifetime hunting and fishing license which shall
13 entitle the licensee to all of the privileges conferred by basic hunting, deer,
14 waterfowl, and turkey hunting licenses; basic fishing, saltwater, crab, and
15 recreational fishing gear licenses; and basic wildlife management area access
16 permits.  Until June 1, 2022, the department shall make available for persons from
17 birth to five years old who were born in Louisiana a combination lifetime hunting
18 and fishing license.  Any such license purchased prior to June 1, 2022, shall entitle
19 the licensee to all of the privileges of both lifetime hunting and lifetime sports
20 fishing licenses provided in R.S. 56:649.1 and 649.2.  After June 1, 2022, the license
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 24RS-602	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 400
1 shall be in lieu of basic hunting, deer, waterfowl, and turkey hunting licenses, basic,
2 saltwater, crab, and recreational fishing gear licenses, and shall permit WMA access.
3	*          *          *
4 §3005.  Lifetime licenses
5	A.  Louisiana resident Resident $500.00
6	(1)  Infant (under three years)	$500.00
7	(2)  Adult (ages three through sixty-four) $1,000.00
8	(3)  Senior (sixty-five years or older) $100.00
9	B.  Nonresident	$4,000.00
10	(1)  Infant (under three years)	$1,000.00
11	(2)  Adult (three years and older) $4,000.00
12	C.  Youth resident (any resident under the age of eighteen) $500.00
13 Beginning January 1, 2028, and on January first of each year thereafter, the secretary
14 may adjust the fees in this Section by an amount not to exceed the annual percentage
15 increase in the Consumer Price Index published by the United States Department of
16 Labor.  The adjusted amount shall be rounded down to the nearest dollar.  The
17 secretary shall maintain a list of current fees for lifetime combination licenses on the
18 department's website.
19	D.  Senior (any resident sixty five years or older) $100.00
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 400 Original 2024 Regular Session	Riser
Abstract:  Establishes resident and nonresident infant lifetime hunting and fishing licenses
for children under three years old, increases the fee for adult resident lifetime
hunting and fishing licenses, and authorizes the secretary of the Dept. of Wildlife and
Fisheries to adjust lifetime license fees for inflation starting three years after these
changes go into effect.
Present law recognizes infant lifetime combination hunting and fishing licenses issued prior
to June 1, 2022, when the license stopped issuing these licenses.
Proposed law re-creates the infant lifetime combination license for children under three
years old and requires the department to make such licenses available starting Jan. 1, 2025.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 24RS-602	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 400
Present law establishes fees for lifetime combination hunting and fishing licenses for
residents, nonresidents, resident youth, and resident seniors.
Proposed law adds fees for resident ($500) and nonresident ($1,000) infant lifetime licenses.
Proposed law removes the resident youth lifetime license.
Proposed law increases the existing fee for resident adult lifetime licenses from $500 to
$1,000.
Proposed law provides that all lifetime license fees shall be indexed for inflation using the
Consumer Price Index starting Jan. 1, 2028.
(Amends R.S. 56:649.7 and 3005)
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.