Louisiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB450 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 450 Engrossed	2024 Regular Session	Schamerhorn
Abstract:  Re-creates the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections for four more years. Changes
termination date from July 1, 2025 to July 1, 2029.
Present law ("Sunset" law) provides that the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections and all the
statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on
July 1, 2024, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2025, unless
the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities
prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections and
its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2024, in accordance with the Sunset law.  Supersedes the
provisions of the Sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which
require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional
provisions.  July 1, 2029, is the new termination date, and termination would begin July 1, 2028,
unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2024.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(2)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(d))