Louisiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB450 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 77 (HB 450) 2024 Regular Session Schamerhorn
Prior law ("Sunset" law) provided that the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections and all the
statutory entities made a part of the department by law were required to begin to terminate
their operations on July 1, 2024, and that all legislative authority for such entities ceased as
of July 1, 2025, unless the legislature enacted a bill that authorized the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections
and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2024, in accordance with the Sunset law. 
Supersedes the provisions of the Sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-
creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the
department along with additional provisions.  July 1, 2029, is the new termination date, and
termination would begin July 1, 2028, unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2024.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(2)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(d))