Louisiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB463 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    SSHB463 3351 4770
HOUSE SUMMARY OF SENATE AMENDMENTS
HB 463	2024 Regular Session	Egan
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Department of Justice
Synopsis of Senate Amendments
1.Makes technical changes.
2.Adds provisions to provide for the re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation
and Development.
Digest of Bill as Finally Passed by Senate
Present law ("sunset" law) provides that the Dept. of Justice and the Dept. of Transportation
and Development and each of its statutory entities shall begin to terminate their operations
on July 1, 2024, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1,
2025, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its
statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Justice and each of its
statutory entities effective June 30, 2024, in accordance with the sunset law.  Supersedes the
provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and
which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along
with additional provisions.  July 1, 2031, is the new termination date for the Dept. of Justice,
and termination would begin July 1, 2030, unless the department is again re-created.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation and
Development and it statutory entities effective June 30, 2024.  July 1, 2026, is the new
termination date for the Dept. of Transportation and Development, and termination would
begin July 1, 2025.
Effective June 30, 2024.
(Amends R.S. 49:191(3); Repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(a))
Page 1 of 1