Louisiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB463 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REP ORT DIGEST
HB 463	2024 Regular Session	Egan
Keyword and oneliner of the instrument as it left the House
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Department of Justice
Report rejects Senate amendments which would have:
1. Provided for the re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation and Development.
Report amends the bill to:
1. Remove the provisions that re-created the Dept. of Transportation and Development.
Digest of the bill as proposed by the Conference Committee
Present law ("sunset" law) provides that the Dept. of Justice and its statutory entities shall begin to
terminate their operations on July 1, 2024, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall
cease as of July 1, 2025, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Justice and each of its
statutory entities effective June 30, 2024, in accordance with the sunset law. Supersedes the
provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require
a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along
with additional provisions. July 1, 2031, is the new termination date for the Dept. of Justice,
and termination would begin July 1, 2030, unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2024.
(Amends R.S. 49:191(3); Repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(a))