RÉSUMÉ DIGEST ACT 619 (HB 463) 2024 Regular Session Egan Existing law ("sunset" law) provides that the Dept. of Justice and its statutory entities shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2024, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2025, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Justice and each of its statutory entities effective June 30, 2024, in accordance with the sunset law. Supersedes the provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. July 1, 2031, is the new termination date for the Dept. of Justice, and termination would begin July 1, 2030, unless the department is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2024. (Amends R.S. 49:191(3); Repeals R.S. 49:191(12)(a))